Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1088 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodriguez S.B. No. 1088
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 11, 2011,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 13, Nays 0; April 11, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1088 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the imposition by certain municipalities and municipal
 transit departments of the local sales and use tax in certain
 federal military installations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 321, Tax Code, is amended
 by adding Section 321.1045 to read as follows:
 Sec. 321.1045.  IMPOSITION OF SALES AND USE TAX IN CERTAIN
 FEDERAL MILITARY INSTALLATIONS. (a)  This section applies only to
 a municipality with a population of more than 500,000 that borders
 the United Mexican States.
 (b)  For purposes of the sales and use tax imposed under this
 chapter, a reference in this chapter or other law to the
 municipality as the territory in which the tax or an incident of the
 tax applies includes the area within the boundaries of a federal
 military installation that is located in the municipality's
 extraterritorial jurisdiction.
 (c)  This section does not affect:
 (1)  the boundaries of an emergency services district
 that contains territory within the boundaries of a federal military
 installation on the effective date of this section;
 (2)  the authority of that emergency services district
 to continue to impose a sales and use tax in the entire territory of
 the district; or
 (3)  the duty of that emergency services district to
 provide services in the entire territory of the district.
 SECTION 2.  Section 453.051, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The jurisdiction of a transit department created by a
 municipality with a population of more than 500,000 that borders
 the United Mexican States does not include any territory within the
 boundaries of a federal military installation that is located in
 that municipality's extraterritorial jurisdiction.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect July 1, 2011, if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for effect on that
 date, this Act takes effect October 1, 2011.
 * * * * *