Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1094 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Rodriguez S.B. No. 1094
 (In the Senate - Filed March 2, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; March 31, 2011,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 31, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1094 By:  Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the availability of online testing for high school
 equivalency examinations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7.111, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  If the national entity that develops and delivers high
 school equivalency examinations authorizes online testing, the
 board by rule shall provide for administration of the examinations
 online.  The rules must provide a procedure for verifying the
 identity of the person taking the examination.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2011-2012
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *