Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1117 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Whitmire S.B. No. 1117
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 21, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 21, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of a parent contributing to the
 nonattendance of a public school student.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 25.093, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  If a warning is issued as required by Section 25.095(a),
 the parent intentionally [with criminal negligence] fails to
 require the child to attend school as required by law, and the child
 has absences for the amount of time specified under Section 25.094,
 the parent commits an offense.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect at the time the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *