Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1125 Introduced / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    82R11510 ALL-F
 By: Carona S.B. No. 1125


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to energy efficiency goals and programs and the
 participation of loads in certain energy markets.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.905, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection (h) to read
 as follows:
 (a)  It is the goal of the legislature that:
 (1)  electric utilities will administer energy
 efficiency incentive programs in a market-neutral,
 nondiscriminatory manner but will not offer underlying competitive
 services;
 (2)  all customers, in all customer classes, will have
 a choice of and access to energy efficiency alternatives and other
 choices from the market that allow each customer to reduce energy
 consumption, peak demand, or energy costs;
 (3)  each electric utility annually will provide,
 through a cost-effective portfolio of market-based standard offer
 programs or through limited, targeted, market-transformation
 programs, incentives sufficient for retail electric providers and
 competitive energy service providers to acquire additional
 [cost-effective] energy efficiency for the utility's [residential
 and commercial] customers, other than customers who operate a
 transmission-level voltage facility, equivalent to at least
 one-half of one[:
 [(A) 10] percent of the electric utility's peak
 [annual growth in] demand, not including demand from
 transmission-level industrial facilities, [of residential and
 commercial customers] by January 1, 2013 [December 31, 2007;
 [(B)     15 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2008, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2008 funding may not be greater than 75 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential and
 commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006, filing; and
 [(C)     20 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2009, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2009 funding may not be greater than 150 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential and
 commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006, filing];
 (4)  each electric utility in the ERCOT region shall
 use its best efforts to encourage and facilitate the involvement of
 the region's retail electric providers in the delivery of
 efficiency programs and demand response programs under this
 section;
 (5)  retail electric providers in the ERCOT region, and
 electric utilities outside of the ERCOT region, shall provide
 customers with energy efficiency educational materials; [and]
 (6)  notwithstanding Subsection (a)(3), electric
 utilities shall continue to make available, at 2007 funding and
 participation levels, any load management standard offer programs
 developed for industrial customers and implemented prior to May 1,
 2007; and
 (7)  electric utilities may communicate with and
 provide rebate or incentive funds to their customers to promote or
 facilitate the success of programs implemented under this section.
 (b)  The commission shall provide oversight and adopt rules
 and procedures to ensure that the utilities can achieve the goal of
 this section, including:
 (1)  establishing an energy efficiency cost recovery
 factor for ensuring timely and reasonable cost recovery for utility
 expenditures made to satisfy the goal of this section;
 (2)  establishing an incentive under Section 36.204 to
 reward utilities administering programs under this section that
 exceed the minimum goals established by this section;
 (3)  providing a utility that is unable to establish an
 energy efficiency cost recovery factor in a timely manner due to a
 rate freeze with a mechanism to enable the utility to:
 (A)  defer the costs of complying with this
 section; and
 (B)  recover the deferred costs through an energy
 efficiency cost recovery factor on the expiration of the rate
 freeze period;
 (4)  ensuring that the costs associated with programs
 provided under this section are borne by the customer classes that
 receive the services under the programs; [and]
 (5)  ensuring the program rules encourage the value of
 the incentives to be passed on to the end-use customer;
 (6)  ensuring that programs are evaluated, measured,
 and verified using a framework established by the commission that
 promotes effective program design and consistent and streamlined
 reporting; and
 (7)  ensuring that an independent organization
 certified under Section 39.151 allows load participation in all
 energy markets for residential, commercial, and industrial
 customer classes, either directly or through aggregators of retail
 customers, to increase market efficiency, competition, and
 customer benefits.
 (h)  The commission shall develop a standard disclosure form
 and require an energy efficiency provider to use the form to help
 consumers make better informed decisions regarding energy
 efficiency investments. The form must include disclosures
 regarding:
 (1)  the full scope of incentives that are available to
 the consumer for the energy efficiency measure the consumer is
 considering, including all utility, city, county, state, and
 national incentives;
 (2)  the value of any incentives used to reduce the
 costs of products or services offered passed on to the energy
 service provider marketing its energy efficiency program;
 (3)  other related energy efficiency incentives that
 are available to the consumer; and
 (4)  the consumer's estimated energy savings and
 payback period.
 SECTION 2.  Section 39.905(b-2), Utilities Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 3.  (a) The Public Utility Commission of Texas shall
 conduct a study to determine:
 (1)  the effect of including avoided transmission and
 distribution capacity costs as a factor included in an analysis
 used to determine whether programs are cost-effective;
 (2)  the appropriate cost of energy to be included as a
 factor included in an analysis used to determine whether programs
 are cost-effective;
 (3)  how the reductions in energy demand and energy
 consumption provided by energy efficiency programs affect the
 market clearing price in ERCOT for the balancing energy market
 during peak and nonpeak periods; and
           (4)  ways to include the associated changes in energy
 prices due to the effect of energy efficiency programs, as found
 under Subdivision (3) of this subsection, as a factor included in an
 analysis used to determine whether a program is cost-effective.
 (b)  The commission shall report its findings from the study
 conducted under this section to the legislature not later than
 September 1, 2012.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.