Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1125 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Carona S.B. No. 1125
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 April 11, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 11, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1125 By:  Carona


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to energy efficiency goals and programs and the
 participation of loads in certain energy markets.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 39.905, Utilities Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsections (h) through
 (l) to read as follows:
 (a)  It is the goal of the legislature that:
 (1)  electric utilities will administer energy
 efficiency incentive programs in a market-neutral,
 nondiscriminatory manner but will not offer underlying competitive
 services;
 (2)  all customers, in all customer classes, will have
 a choice of and access to energy efficiency alternatives and other
 choices from the market that allow each customer to reduce energy
 consumption, summer and winter peak demand, or energy costs;
 (3)  each electric utility annually will provide,
 through market-based standard offer programs or through [limited,]
 targeted[,] market-transformation programs, incentives sufficient
 for retail electric providers and competitive energy service
 providers to acquire additional cost-effective energy efficiency,
 subject to cost ceilings established by the commission, for the
 utility's residential and commercial customers equivalent to [at
 least]:
 (A)  not less than:
 (i)  30 [10] percent of the electric
 utility's annual growth in demand of residential and commercial
 customers by December 31 of each year, beginning with the 2013
 calendar year; and
 (ii)  the amount of energy efficiency to be
 acquired for the utility's residential and commercial customers for
 the most recent preceding year[, 2007]; and
 (B)  for an electric utility whose amount of
 energy efficiency to be acquired under this subsection is
 equivalent to at least four-tenths of one percent of the electric
 utility's summer weather-adjusted peak demand for residential and
 commercial customers in the previous calendar year, not less than:
 (i)  four-tenths of one percent of the
 utility's summer weather-adjusted peak demand for residential and
 commercial customers by December 31 of each subsequent year; and
 (ii)  the amount of energy efficiency to be
 acquired for the utility's residential and commercial customers for
 the most recent preceding year [15 percent of the electric
 utility's annual growth in demand of residential and commercial
 customers by December 31, 2008, provided that the electric
 utility's program expenditures for 2008 funding may not be greater
 than 75 percent above the utility's program budget for 2007 for
 residential and commercial customers, as included in the April 1,
 2006, filing; and
 [(C)     20 percent of the electric utility's annual
 growth in demand of residential and commercial customers by
 December 31, 2009, provided that the electric utility's program
 expenditures for 2009 funding may not be greater than 150 percent
 above the utility's program budget for 2007 for residential and
 commercial customers, as included in the April 1, 2006, filing];
 (4)  each electric utility in the ERCOT region shall
 use its best efforts to encourage and facilitate the involvement of
 the region's retail electric providers in the delivery of
 efficiency programs and demand response programs under this
 section;
 (5)  retail electric providers in the ERCOT region, and
 electric utilities outside of the ERCOT region, shall provide
 customers with energy efficiency educational materials; and
 (6)  notwithstanding Subsection (a)(3), electric
 utilities shall continue to make available, at 2007 funding and
 participation levels, any load management standard offer programs
 developed for industrial customers and implemented prior to May 1,
 2007.
 (b)  The commission shall provide oversight and adopt rules
 and procedures to ensure that the utilities can achieve the goal of
 this section, including:
 (1)  establishing an energy efficiency cost recovery
 factor for ensuring timely and reasonable cost recovery for utility
 expenditures made to satisfy the goal of this section;
 (2)  establishing an incentive under Section 36.204 to
 reward utilities administering programs under this section that
 exceed the minimum goals established by this section;
 (3)  providing a utility that is unable to establish an
 energy efficiency cost recovery factor in a timely manner due to a
 rate freeze with a mechanism to enable the utility to:
 (A)  defer the costs of complying with this
 section; and
 (B)  recover the deferred costs through an energy
 efficiency cost recovery factor on the expiration of the rate
 freeze period;
 (4)  ensuring that the costs associated with programs
 provided under this section and any shareholder bonus awarded are
 borne by the customer classes that receive the services under the
 programs; [and]
 (5)  ensuring the program rules encourage the value of
 the incentives to be passed on to the end-use customer;
 (6)  ensuring that programs are evaluated, measured,
 and verified using a framework established by the commission that
 promotes effective program design and consistent and streamlined
 reporting; and
 (7)  ensuring that an independent organization
 certified under Section 39.151 allows load participation in all
 energy markets for residential, commercial, and industrial
 customer classes, either directly or through aggregators of retail
 customers, to the extent that load participation by each of those
 customer classes complies with reasonable requirements adopted by
 the organization relating to the reliability and adequacy of the
 regional electric network in a manner that will increase market
 efficiency, competition, and customer benefits.
 (h)  For an electric utility operating in an area not open to
 competition, the utility may achieve the goal of this section by:
 (1)  providing rebate or incentive funds directly to
 customers to promote or facilitate the success of programs
 implemented under this section; or
 (2)  developing, subject to commission approval, new
 programs other than standard offer programs and market
 transformation programs, to the extent that the new programs
 satisfy the same cost-effectiveness requirements as standard offer
 programs and market transformation programs.
 (i)  Energy efficiency measure recommendations provided
 directly to residential, commercial, and nonprofit,
 nongovernmental consumers by energy service providers must include
 a written disclosure regarding whether the energy service provider
 receives any financial benefit from recommending particular energy
 efficiency measures, specifying the energy efficiency measures
 from which it receives a financial benefit.
 (j)  For an electric utility operating in an area open to
 competition, on demonstration to the commission, after a contested
 case hearing, that the requirements under Subsection (a) cannot be
 met in a rural area through retail electric providers or
 competitive energy service providers, the utility may achieve the
 goal of this section by providing rebate or incentive funds
 directly to customers in the rural area to promote or facilitate the
 success of programs implemented under this section.
 (k)  An electric utility may use energy audit programs to
 achieve the goal of this section if:
 (1)  the programs do not constitute more than three
 percent of total program costs under this section; and
 (2)  the addition of the programs does not cause a
 utility's portfolio of programs to no longer be cost-effective.
 (l)  To help a residential or nongovernmental nonprofit
 customer make informed decisions regarding energy efficiency, the
 commission may consider program designs that ensure, to the extent
 practicable, that the customer is provided with information using
 standardized forms and terms that allow the customer to compare
 offers for varying degrees of energy efficiency attainable using a
 measure the customer is considering by cost, estimated energy
 savings, and payback periods.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (b-2), Section 39.905, Utilities
 Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *