Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1130 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1130


 AN ACT
 relating to the exception from required public disclosure of
 certain records of an appraisal district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (e), Section 552.149, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (e)  This section applies to information described by
 Subsections (a), (c), and (d) and to an item of information or
 comparable sales data described by Subsection (b) only if the
 information, item of information, or comparable sales data relates
 to real property that is located in a county having a population of
 [20,000 or] more than 50,000.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1130 passed the Senate on
 April 21, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 27, 2011, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 28, 2011, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2011, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1130 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 28, 2011, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 29, 2011, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 140, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor