Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1130 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hegar S.B. No. 1130
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Select Committee on Open Government;
 April 12, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 0; April 12, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1130 By:  Davis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exception from required public disclosure of
 certain records of an appraisal district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (e), Section 552.149, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (e)  This section applies to information described by
 Subsections (a), (c), and (d) and to an item of information or
 comparable sales data described by Subsection (b) only if the
 information, item of information, or comparable sales data relates
 to real property that is located in a county having a population of
 [20,000 or] more than 50,000.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *