Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1133 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Hegar S.B. No. 1133
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 24, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 24, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1133 By:  Estes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a report by the Public Utility Commission of Texas on
 the ability of electric generators to respond to abnormal weather
 conditions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 186, Utilities Code, is
 amended by adding Section 186.007 to read as follows:
 Sec. 186.007.  WEATHER EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS REPORT.
 (a)  The Public Utility Commission of Texas, along with the
 Electric Reliability Council of Texas, shall analyze emergency
 operations plans developed by power generation companies and
 wholesale electric generators within the Electric Reliability
 Council of Texas and prepare a weather emergency preparedness
 report on power generation companies' and wholesale electric
 generators' preparedness to provide continuous electric utility
 service in the event of a weather-related forced interruption.  In
 preparing the report, the commission shall:
 (1)  review the emergency operations plans currently on
 file with the commission;
 (2)  analyze and determine whether the plans are
 adequate to ensure the ability of the electric grid to withstand
 abnormal weather events in the upcoming year;
 (3)  consider the anticipated weather patterns for the
 upcoming year as forecasted by the National Weather Service or any
 similar state or national agency; and
 (4)  make recommendations on improving emergency
 operations plans and procedures in order to ensure the continuity
 of electric utility service.
 (b)  The commission may require a power generation company or
 wholesale electric generator to file an updated emergency
 operations plan if it finds that an emergency operations plan on
 file does not contain adequate information to determine whether the
 company or generator can ensure the continuity of electric utility
 service in the event of a weather-related forced interruption.
 (c)  The commission may adopt rules relating to the
 implementation of the report described by Subsection (a) and any
 other rules necessary to accomplish the purposes of the report.
 (d)  The commission shall submit the report described by
 Subsection (a) to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, and the members of the legislature not later
 than September 30, 2012.
 (e)  The commission may submit subsequent weather emergency
 preparedness reports if the commission finds that significant
 changes to weatherization techniques have occurred or are necessary
 to protect consumers or vital services, or if there have been
 changes to statutes or rules relating to weatherization
 requirements.  A report under this subsection must be submitted not
 later than:
 (1)  March 1 for a summer weather emergency
 preparedness report; and
 (2)  September 1 for a winter weather emergency
 preparedness report.
 (f)  The commission may require a power generation company or
 wholesale electric generator that experiences repeated or major
 weather-related forced interruptions of electric utility service
 to obtain a third-party assessment of the company's or generator's
 weatherization plans, procedures, and operations and to implement
 any recommendation the third party makes.
 (g)  Notwithstanding any other provision of state law, the
 emergency operations plans of power generation companies and
 wholesale electric generators considered in the publication of the
 report described by Subsection (a) and any subsequent plans
 submitted under Subsection (e) are not confidential or otherwise
 exempt from disclosure under Chapter 552, Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *