Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1134 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hegar S.B. No. 1134
 (In the Senate - Filed March 3, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 7, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 7, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1134 By:  Hegar


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of permits for certain facilities
 regulated by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 382, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Sections 382.051961, 382.051962, and
 382.051963 to read as follows:
 Sec. 382.051961.  PERMIT FOR CERTAIN OIL AND GAS
 FACILITIES. (a)  This section applies only to new facilities or
 modifications of existing facilities that belong to Standard
 Industrial Classification Codes 1311 (Crude Petroleum and Natural
 Gas), 1321 (Natural Gas Liquids), 4612 (Crude Petroleum Pipelines),
 4613 (Refined Petroleum Pipelines), 4922 (Natural Gas
 Transmission), and 4923 (Natural Gas Transmission and
 Distribution).
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter,
 the commission may not adopt a new permit by rule or a new standard
 permit or amend an existing permit by rule or an existing standard
 permit relating to a facility to which this section applies unless
 the commission:
 (1)  conducts a regulatory analysis as provided by
 Section 2001.0225, Government Code;
 (2)  determines, based on the evaluation of credible
 air quality monitoring data, that the emissions limits or other
 emissions-related requirements of the permit are necessary to
 protect public health and physical property;
 (3)  establishes emissions limits or other
 requirements based on:
 (A)  the evaluation of air quality monitoring
 data; and
 (B)  credible air quality modeling that is not
 based on the worst-case scenario of emissions or other worst-case
 modeling scenarios unless the actual air quality monitoring data
 and evaluation of that data indicate that the worst-case scenario
 of emissions or other worst-case modeling scenarios yield modeling
 results that reflect the actual air quality monitoring data and
 evaluation; and
 (4)  considers whether the requirements of the permit
 should be imposed only on facilities that are located in a
 particular geographic region of the state.
 Sec. 382.051962.  AUTHORIZATION FOR PLANNED MAINTENANCE,
 START-UP, OR SHUTDOWN ACTIVITIES RELATING TO CERTAIN OIL AND GAS
 FACILITIES.  (a)  In this section, "planned maintenance, start-up,
 or shutdown activity" means an activity with emissions or opacity
 that:
 (1)  is not expressly authorized by commission permit,
 rule, or order and involves the maintenance, start-up, or shutdown
 of a facility;
 (2)  is part of normal or routine facility operations;
 (3)  is predictable as to timing; and
 (4)  involves the type of emissions normally authorized
 by permit.
 (b)  The commission may adopt one or more permits by rule or
 one or more standard permits and may amend one or more existing
 permits by rule or standard permits to authorize planned
 maintenance, start-up, or shutdown activities for facilities
 described by Section 382.051961(a).  The adoption or amendment of a
 permit under this subsection must comply with Section
 382.051961(b).
 (c)  An unauthorized emission or opacity event from a planned
 maintenance, start-up, or shutdown activity is subject to the
 affirmative defense criteria established by commission rules as
 those rules exist on the effective date of this section if:
 (1)  the emission or opacity event occurs at a facility
 described by Section 382.051961(a);
 (2)  an application for a permit or permit amendment
 under Subsection (b) is submitted to the commission on or before
 January 5, 2014; and
 (3)  the affirmative defense criteria in the rules are
 met.
 (d)  The affirmative defense described by Subsection (c) is
 not available for a facility on or after the date that an
 application to authorize the planned maintenance, start-up, or
 shutdown activities of the facility is approved, denied, or voided.
 Sec. 382.051963.  AMENDMENT OF CERTAIN PERMITS. (a)  A
 permit by rule or standard permit that has been adopted by the
 commission under this subchapter and is in effect on the effective
 date of this section may be amended to require:
 (1)  the permit holder to provide to the commission
 information about a facility authorized by the permit, including
 the location of the facility; and
 (2)  a facility handling sour gas to be a minimum
 distance from a recreational area, a residence, or another
 structure unless the structure is not occupied or is used solely by
 the operator of the facility or by the owner of the property upon
 which the facility is located.
 (b)  The amendment of a permit under this section is not
 subject to Section 382.051961(b).
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Sections 382.051961, 382.051962, and
 382.051963, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, apply only
 to a new permit by rule or a new standard permit or any amendment to
 an existing permit by rule or amendment to an existing standard
 permit adopted by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality on
 or after the effective date of this Act.
 (b)  A permit by rule or standard permit adopted by the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality and in effect before the
 effective date of this Act is not subject to Sections 382.051961 and
 382.051962, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *