S.B. No. 1154 AN ACT relating to a task force for the development of a strategy to reduce child abuse and neglect and improve child welfare. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Chapter 264, Family Code, is amended by adding Subchapter H-1 to read as follows: SUBCHAPTER H-1. TASK FORCE TO REDUCE CHILD ABUSE AND NEGLECT AND IMPROVE CHILD WELFARE Sec. 264.721. ESTABLISHMENT OF TASK FORCE. A task force is established under this subchapter to develop a strategy to reduce child abuse and neglect and improve child welfare. Sec. 264.722. TASK FORCE. (a) The task force consists of nine members appointed as follows: (1) seven members appointed by the governor, two of whom must be appointed from a list of candidates submitted by the speaker of the house of representatives; and (2) two members appointed by the lieutenant governor. (b) Members of the task force must be individuals who: (1) are actively involved in the prevention of child abuse and neglect and the improvement of child welfare; and (2) represent a diversity of backgrounds. (c) Appointments to the task force shall be made without regard to the race, color, disability, sex, religion, age, or national origin of the appointee. (d) A task force member is not entitled to compensation for service on the task force but is entitled to reimbursement for travel expenses as provided by Chapter 660, Government Code, and the General Appropriations Act. (e) The task force shall elect a presiding officer by a majority vote of the membership of the task force. (f) The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding officer. (g) Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the task force. Sec. 264.723. TASK FORCE DUTIES. (a) The task force shall identify: (1) all existing programs in the state relating to reducing child abuse and neglect or improving child welfare; and (2) the programs described by Subdivision (1) that receive state money. (b) The task force shall establish a strategy for reducing child abuse and neglect and for improving child welfare in this state. In establishing that strategy, the task force shall: (1) gather information concerning child safety, child abuse and neglect, and child welfare throughout the state; (2) receive reports and testimony from individuals, state and local agencies, community-based organizations, and other public and private organizations; (3) create goals for state policy that would improve child safety, prevent child abuse and neglect, and improve child welfare; (4) review and revise the strategic plan to accomplish those goals submitted by a previous task force; and (5) submit the revised strategic plan. (c) The revised strategic plan submitted under Subsection (b) may include proposals for specific statutory changes, the creation of new programs, and methods to foster cooperation among state agencies and between the state and local governments. Sec. 264.724. SUPPORT AGENCY DUTIES. The department, the Department of State Health Services, the Texas Department of Criminal Justice, the Texas Youth Commission, the Texas Juvenile Probation Commission, The University of Texas System, and The Texas A&M University System shall: (1) provide administrative support services to the task force; (2) coordinate administrative responsibilities with the task force to avoid unnecessary duplication of duties; (3) share equally the costs of the task force, including reimbursement for travel expenses, administrative expenses, and the costs of publishing the task force's strategic plan; and (4) each designate a person to serve as the agency liaison with the task force. Sec. 264.725. CONSULTATION WITH OTHER AGENCIES; PRIVATE FOUNDATIONS. (a) The task force shall consult with employees of the department, the Department of State Health Services, the Texas Department of Criminal Justice, the Texas Youth Commission, the Texas Juvenile Probation Commission, The University of Texas System, and The Texas A&M University System as necessary to accomplish the task force's responsibilities under this subchapter. (b) The task force shall cooperate as necessary with any other state agency. (c) The task force may consult with private foundations that have made a substantial commitment to the prevention of child abuse in this state to accomplish the task force's responsibilities under this chapter. Sec. 264.726. FUNDING; ACCOUNT. (a) The task force shall review the funding strategies for the task force and develop proposals for expanding the sources of funds available to finance the activities of the task force. (b) The task force may accept gifts and grants from individuals or private or public organizations and accept federal and local funds to support the task force. (c) The child abuse reduction task force account is an account in the general revenue fund. Money in the account may be appropriated only to the task force for the purposes of this subchapter. The child abuse reduction task force account is exempt from the application of Section 403.095, Government Code. The account consists of: (1) gifts and grants to the task force; (2) money received by the task force from the federal, state, or local government; and (3) notwithstanding Section 404.071, Government Code, all interest attributable to money held in the account. Sec. 264.727. SUBMISSION OF PLAN. Not later than December 1, 2012, the task force shall submit the strategic plan required by Section 264.723 to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of representatives. Sec. 264.728. EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and this subchapter expires September 1, 2013. SECTION 2. The governor and lieutenant governor shall appoint the members of the task force as required by Section 264.722, Family Code, as added by this Act, not later than October 1, 2011. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1154 passed the Senate on April 13, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1154 passed the House on May 20, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 12, one present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor