Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1164 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1164
 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 26, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 26, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1164 By:  Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to optional annuity increases and annual supplemental
 payments for certain retirees and beneficiaries of the Texas
 Municipal Retirement System.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (c), Section 853.404, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The governing body of a participating municipality that
 adopts an ordinance under Section 854.203 providing for increased
 annuities effective January 1 of a designated year may further
 provide in the ordinance that increases in annuities will be
 credited effective January 1 of each year following the designated
 year based on recomputations made as provided by Section 854.203(b)
 [854.203(b)(1)] for each year following the initial computation,
 and using the fraction specified in the ordinance as required under
 Section 854.203(b) [854.203(b)(2)] in the recomputations.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 854.203, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 854.203.  OPTIONAL ANNUITY INCREASE OR ANNUAL
 SUPPLEMENTAL PAYMENTS [IN RETIREMENT ANNUITIES].
 SECTION 3.  Section 854.203, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a), (b), (f), and (g) and adding Subsections
 (b-1), (b-2), (b-3), and (b-4) to read as follows:
 (a)  The governing body of a participating municipality by
 ordinance, from time to time but not more frequently than once in
 each 12-month period, may authorize and provide for an increased
 annuity, a supplemental payment, or both [annuities] to be paid to
 retirees and beneficiaries of deceased retirees of the
 municipality. An annuity increased under this section replaces any
 annuity or increased annuity previously granted to the same person.
 (b)  The amount of annuity increase under this section is
 computed by one of the following methods:
 (1)  as the sum of the prior and current service
 annuities on the effective date of retirement of the person on whose
 service the annuities are based, multiplied by:
 (A) [(1)]  the percentage change in the Consumer
 Price Index for All Urban Consumers, published by the Bureau of
 Labor Statistics of the United States Department of Labor, from
 December of the year immediately preceding the effective date of
 the person's retirement to the December that is 13 months before the
 effective date of the ordinance providing the annuity increase; and
 (B) [(2)]  30 percent, 50 percent, or 70 percent,
 as specified by the governing body in the ordinance, except that if
 the governing body has specified a different percentage in an
 ordinance adopted under Section 853.404(c) and in effect on
 December 31, 1999, the percentage used in computing annuity
 increases for retirees of that municipality remains in effect until
 changed or discontinued under Section 853.404; or
 (2)  as the sum of the prior and current service
 annuities of the person on whose service the annuities are based on
 the effective date of the annuity increase multiplied by the
 percentage increase specified in the ordinance adopted by the
 governing body, except that an adjustment to an annuity after the
 annuity starting date for annuity increases under this subdivision
 may not cause an annuitant's annuity to exceed the amount that the
 annuitant would be entitled to had 100 percent of the amount
 described by Subdivision (1)(A) been applied to the annuitant's
 annuity on the effective date of retirement.
 (b-1)  An increase under Subsection (b)(2) applies to all
 annuities for which the effective date of retirement of the person
 on whose service the annuity is based is at least 12 months before
 the effective date of the increase.  Notwithstanding any other
 provision of this subtitle, each distribution of a benefit under
 this subtitle must be determined and made in accordance with
 Section 401(a)(9), Internal Revenue Code of 1986. The board of
 trustees may adopt rules it considers necessary to comply with the
 distribution requirements.
 (b-2)  The amount of a supplemental payment under this
 section is an amount equal to the sum of the prior and current
 service annuities of the person on whose service the annuities are
 based on the date that is the 30th day after the effective date of
 the ordinance as described by Subsection (c) multiplied by the
 percentage specified in the ordinance adopted by the governing
 body, which may not exceed 120 percent. A supplemental payment
 under this section must be issued on:
 (1)  March 31, if the effective date of the ordinance
 described by Subsection (c) is January 1; or
 (2)  the 60th day after the date on which the amount of
 the payment is calculated under this subsection, if the effective
 date of the ordinance is not January 1.
 (b-3)  If the effective date of retirement of the person on
 whose service the annuity is based is less than 12 months before the
 date on which the amount of the payment is calculated under
 Subsection (b-2), the supplemental payment shall be prorated based
 on the number of months the person is retired.
 (b-4)  A supplemental payment under this section is an
 obligation of the municipality's account in the municipality
 accumulation fund.
 (f)  An increase granted to an annuitant under Subsection
 (b)(2), or the [The] amount by which an increase under Subsection
 (b)(1) [this section] exceeds all previously granted increases to
 an annuitant is:
 (1)  payable as a prior service annuity;
 (2)  [, is] an obligation of the municipality's account
 in the municipality accumulation fund;[,] and
 (3)  [is] subject to reduction under Section
 855.308(f).
 (g)  An ordinance under this section may not take effect
 until it is approved by the board of trustees as meeting the
 requirements of this section. The board may not approve an
 ordinance unless the actuary first determines that all obligations
 charged against the municipality's account in the municipality
 accumulation fund, including the obligations proposed in the
 ordinance, can be funded by the municipality within its maximum
 contribution rate and within its amortization period as in effect
 on the effective date of the annuity increases or supplemental
 payments.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *