By: Nelson S.B. No. 1177 (In the Senate - Filed March 4, 2011; March 16, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; April 7, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 7, 2011, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1177 By: Nelson A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the adoption by health care facilities of a policy on vaccine preventable diseases; imposing penalties. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. The heading to Subtitle A, Title 4, Health and Safety Code, is amended to read as follows: SUBTITLE A. FINANCING, CONSTRUCTING, REGULATING, AND INSPECTING HEALTH FACILITIES SECTION 2. Subtitle A, Title 4, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Chapter 224 to read as follows: CHAPTER 224. POLICY ON VACCINE PREVENTABLE DISEASES Sec. 224.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter: (1) "Health care facility" means: (A) a facility licensed under Subtitle B of this title, including a hospital as defined by Section 241.003; or (B) a hospital maintained or operated by this state. (2) "Employee" includes: (A) an individual providing direct patient care pursuant to a contract with a health care facility; and (B) an individual to whom a health care facility has granted privileges to provide direct patient care. (3) "Regulatory authority" means a state agency that regulates a health care facility under this code. (4) "Vaccine preventable diseases" means the diseases included in the most current recommendations of the Advisory Committee on Immunization Practices of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention. Sec. 224.002. VACCINE PREVENTABLE DISEASES POLICY REQUIRED. (a) Each health care facility shall develop and implement a policy to protect its patients from vaccine preventable diseases. (b) The policy must: (1) require the employees of the health care facility to receive vaccines for the vaccine preventable diseases specified by the facility based on the level of risk the employee presents to patients by the employee's routine and direct exposure to patients; (2) specify the vaccines a health care facility employee is required to receive based on the level of risk the employee presents to patients by the employee's routine and direct exposure to patients; (3) include procedures for verifying whether a health care facility employee has complied with the policy; (4) include procedures for a health care facility employee to be exempt from the required vaccines for medical reasons; (5) for a health care facility employee who is exempt from the required vaccines, include procedures the employee must follow to protect facility patients from exposure to disease, such as wearing a mask, based on the level of risk the employee presents to patients by the employee's routine and direct exposure to patients; (6) require the health care facility to maintain a written or electronic record of each health care facility employee's compliance with or exemption from the policy; and (7) include disciplinary actions the health care facility is authorized to take against a health care facility employee who fails to comply with the policy. (c) The policy may include procedures for a health care facility employee to be exempt from the required vaccines based on reasons of conscience, including a religious belief. Sec. 224.003. DISASTER EXEMPTION. (a) In this section, "public health disaster" has the meaning assigned by Section 81.003. (b) During a public health disaster, a health care facility may prohibit an employee who is exempt from the vaccines required in the policy developed by the facility under Section 224.002 from having contact with facility patients. Sec. 224.004. DISCIPLINARY ACTION. A health care facility that violates this chapter is subject to an administrative or civil penalty in the same manner, and subject to the same procedures, as if the facility had violated a provision of this code that specifically governs the facility. Sec. 224.005. RULES. The appropriate rulemaking authority for each regulatory authority shall adopt rules necessary to implement this chapter. SECTION 3. Not later than June 1, 2012, a state agency that regulates a health care facility subject to Chapter 224, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, shall adopt the rules necessary to implement that chapter. SECTION 4. Notwithstanding Chapter 224, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, a health care facility subject to that chapter is not required to have a policy on vaccine preventable diseases in effect until September 1, 2012. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. * * * * *