Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1242 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1242
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 30, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the judicial immunity and powers of certain
 magistrates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 54.1176, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The judge shall adopt, modify, or reject the
 magistrate's recommendations not later than the third working day
 after the date the judge receives the recommendations. If the judge
 does not take action in the time provided by this subsection, the
 recommendations of the magistrate are adopted by the judge.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter W, Chapter 54, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 54.1177 to read as follows:
 Sec. 54.1177.  JUDICIAL IMMUNITY. A magistrate appointed
 under this subchapter has the same judicial immunity as a district
 judge.
 SECTION 3.  The changes in law made by this Act to Subsection
 (b), Section 54.1176, Government Code, apply to a cause of action
 referred to a magistrate on or after the effective date of this Act.
 A cause of action referred to a magistrate before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before that
 date, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *