Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1248 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 1248
 (In the Senate - Filed March 7, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 19, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0;
 April 19, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1248 By:  Davis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of State Highway 499 as the
 Colonel Bill Card, Jr., Boulevard.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.084 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.084.  COLONEL BILL CARD, JR., BOULEVARD.  (a)  The
 portion of State Highway 499 from U.S. Highway 77 to County Road 106
 is designated as the Colonel Bill Card, Jr., Boulevard.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 highway number, the designation as the Colonel Bill Card, Jr.,
 Boulevard, and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the boulevard and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the boulevard.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *