Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1258 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Duncan S.B. No. 1258
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 7, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 7, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1258 By:  Duncan


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the disposal of demolition waste from abandoned or
 nuisance buildings in certain areas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 361, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 361.126 to read as follows:
 Sec. 361.126.  DISPOSAL OF DEMOLITION WASTE FROM ABANDONED
 OR NUISANCE BUILDING. (a)  This section applies only to a building
 that has been:
 (1)  abandoned or found to be a nuisance;
 (2)  acquired by the county or municipality by means
 of:
 (A)  bankruptcy;
 (B)  tax delinquency; or
 (C)  condemnation; and
 (3)  previously owned by a person not financially
 capable of paying the costs of the disposal of demolition waste at a
 permitted solid waste disposal facility, including transportation
 of the waste to the facility.
 (b)  The commission may issue a permit by rule to authorize
 the governing body of a county or municipality with a population of
 10,000 or less to dispose of demolition waste from a building if the
 disposal occurs on land that:
 (1)  the county or municipality owns or controls; and
 (2)  would qualify for an arid exemption under
 commission rules.
 (c)  The commission may adopt rules under Section 361.024 to
 control the collection, handling, storage, processing, and
 disposal of demolition waste under this section to protect public
 and private property, rights-of-way, groundwater, and any other
 right that requires protection.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *