Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1285 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1285


 AN ACT
 relating to contributions to the retirement systems for certain
 police officers in certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subdivisions (1) and (2), Subsection (a),
 Section 8.01, Chapter 452 (S.B. 738), Acts of the 72nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 1991 (Article 6243n-1, Vernon's Texas Civil
 Statutes), are amended to read as follows:
 (1)  Deposits by the members to the police retirement
 system shall be made at a rate of at least 13 [six] percent of the
 basic hourly earnings of each member.  Deposits required to be made
 by members shall be deducted from payroll.  On recommendation of the
 board, the Active--Contributory members may by a majority of those
 voting increase the rate of member deposits above 13 [six] percent
 to whatever amount the board has recommended.  If the deposit rate
 for members has been increased to a rate above 13 [six] percent, the
 rate may be decreased if the board recommends the decrease, the
 board's actuary approves the decrease, and a majority of the
 Active--Contributory members voting on the matter approve the
 decrease.
 (2)  The city shall contribute amounts equal to 18
 percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the
 city for all periods on or before September 30, 2010, subject to
 additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of this
 subsection.  The city shall contribute amounts equal to 19 percent
 of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the city for
 all periods after September 30, 2010, and before October 1, 2011,
 subject to additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of
 this subsection.  The city shall contribute amounts equal to 20
 percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the
 city for all periods after September 30, 2011, and before October 1,
 2012, subject to additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3)
 of this subsection. The city shall contribute amounts equal to 21
 percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the
 city for all periods after September 30, 2012, subject to
 additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of this
 subsection. The city council may also authorize the city to make
 additional contributions to the police retirement system in
 whatever amount the city council may determine.  Contributions by
 the city shall be made each pay period.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1285 passed the Senate on
 May 10, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2011, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1285 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 107,
 Nays 35, three present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor