S.B. No. 1285 AN ACT relating to contributions to the retirement systems for certain police officers in certain municipalities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subdivisions (1) and (2), Subsection (a), Section 8.01, Chapter 452 (S.B. 738), Acts of the 72nd Legislature, Regular Session, 1991 (Article 6243n-1, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), are amended to read as follows: (1) Deposits by the members to the police retirement system shall be made at a rate of at least 13 [six] percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member. Deposits required to be made by members shall be deducted from payroll. On recommendation of the board, the Active--Contributory members may by a majority of those voting increase the rate of member deposits above 13 [six] percent to whatever amount the board has recommended. If the deposit rate for members has been increased to a rate above 13 [six] percent, the rate may be decreased if the board recommends the decrease, the board's actuary approves the decrease, and a majority of the Active--Contributory members voting on the matter approve the decrease. (2) The city shall contribute amounts equal to 18 percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the city for all periods on or before September 30, 2010, subject to additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of this subsection. The city shall contribute amounts equal to 19 percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the city for all periods after September 30, 2010, and before October 1, 2011, subject to additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of this subsection. The city shall contribute amounts equal to 20 percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the city for all periods after September 30, 2011, and before October 1, 2012, subject to additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of this subsection. The city shall contribute amounts equal to 21 percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the city for all periods after September 30, 2012, subject to additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of this subsection. The city council may also authorize the city to make additional contributions to the police retirement system in whatever amount the city council may determine. Contributions by the city shall be made each pay period. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1285 passed the Senate on May 10, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1285 passed the House, with amendment, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 107, Nays 35, three present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor