Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1285 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1285
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 27, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 27, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to contributions to the retirement systems for certain
 police officers in certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subdivision (2), Subsection (a), Section 8.01,
 Chapter 452 (S.B. 738), Acts of the 72nd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 1991 (Article 6243n-1, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), is
 amended to read as follows:
 (2)  The city shall contribute amounts equal to 18
 percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the
 city for all periods on or before September 30, 2010, subject to
 additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of this
 subsection.  The city shall contribute amounts equal to 19 percent
 of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the city for
 all periods after September 30, 2010, and before October 1, 2011,
 subject to additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of
 this subsection.  The city shall contribute amounts equal to 20
 percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the
 city for all periods after September 30, 2011, and before October 1,
 2012, subject to additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3)
 of this subsection. The city shall contribute amounts equal to 21
 percent of the basic hourly earnings of each member employed by the
 city for all periods after September 30, 2012, subject to
 additional amounts as provided by Subdivision (3) of this
 subsection. The city council may also authorize the city to make
 additional contributions to the police retirement system in
 whatever amount the city council may determine.  Contributions by
 the city shall be made each pay period.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *