S.B. No. 1286 AN ACT relating to the funding of retirement systems for firefighters in certain municipalities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subsections (a) and (b), Section 10.01, Chapter 183 (S.B. 598), Acts of the 64th Legislature, Regular Session, 1975 (Article 6243e.1, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), are amended to read as follows: (a) Each municipality in which a fire department to which this Act applies is located shall appropriate and contribute to the fund an amount equal to a percentage [18.05 percent] of the compensation of all members during that month as follows: (1) 19.05 percent, beginning on the first pay date following September 30, 2010, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2011; (2) 20.05 percent, beginning on the first pay date following September 30, 2011, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2012; (3) 21.05 percent, for 24 pay dates of the municipality beginning on the first pay date following September 30, 2012; and (4) 22.05 percent, for all pay dates of the municipality that follow the 24 pay dates referenced in Subdivision (3) of this subsection. (b) Each firefighter shall pay into the fund each month a percentage [13.70 percent] of the firefighter's compensation for that month as follows: (1) 15.70 percent, for the pay dates of the municipality following September 30, 2010, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2011; (2) 16.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2011, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2012; (3) 16.70 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2012, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2013; (4) 17.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2013, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2014; (5) 17.70 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2014, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2015; (6) 18.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2015, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2016; and (7) 18.70 percent, for the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2016, and all subsequent pay dates of the municipality. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1286 passed the Senate on May 5, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1286 passed the House, with amendment, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 115, Nays 31, three present not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House Approved: ______________________________ Date ______________________________ Governor