By: Watson S.B. No. 1286 (Rodriguez) Substitute the following for S.B. No. 1286: No. A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the funding of retirement systems for firefighters in certain municipalities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subsections (a) and (b), Section 10.01, Chapter 183 (S.B. 598), Acts of the 64th Legislature, Regular Session, 1975 (Article 6243e.1, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), are amended to read as follows: (a) Each municipality in which a fire department to which this Act applies is located shall appropriate and contribute to the fund an amount equal to a percentage [18.05 percent] of the compensation of all members during that month as follows: (1) 19.05 percent, beginning on the first pay date following September 30, 2010, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2011; (2) 20.05 percent, beginning on the first pay date following September 30, 2011, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2012; (3) 21.05 percent, for 24 pay dates of the municipality beginning on the first pay date following September 30, 2012; and (4) 22.05 percent, for all pay dates of the municipality that follow the 24 pay dates referenced in Subdivision (3) of this subsection. (b) Each firefighter shall pay into the fund each month a percentage [13.70 percent] of the firefighter's compensation for that month as follows: (1) 15.70 percent, for the pay dates of the municipality following September 30, 2010, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2011; (2) 16.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2011, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2012; (3) 16.70 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2012, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2013; (4) 17.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2013, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2014; (5) 17.70 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2014, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2015; (6) 18.20 percent, beginning on the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2015, through the pay date immediately preceding September 30, 2016; and (7) 18.70 percent, for the first pay date of the municipality following September 30, 2016, and all subsequent pay dates of the municipality. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.