By: Wentworth S.B. No. 131 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental Relations; March 7, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 7, 2011, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to cemeteries in certain municipalities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 711.008, Health and Safety Code, is amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (h) to read as follows: (a) Except as provided by Subsections (b), (f), (g), (h), and (k), an individual, corporation, partnership, firm, trust, or association may not establish or operate a cemetery, or use any land for the interment of remains, located: (1) in or within one mile of the boundaries of a municipality with a population of 5,000 to 25,000; (2) in or within two miles of the boundaries of a municipality with a population of 25,000 to 50,000; (3) in or within three miles of the boundaries of a municipality with a population of 50,000 to 100,000; (4) in or within four miles of the boundaries of a municipality with a population of 100,000 to 200,000; or (5) in or within five miles of the boundaries of a municipality with a population of at least 200,000. (h) Not later than September 1, 2014, a person may file a written application with the governing body of a municipality to establish or use a cemetery located inside the boundaries of the municipality. The municipality by ordinance shall prescribe the information to be included in the application. The governing body by ordinance may authorize the establishment or use of a cemetery located inside the boundaries of the municipality if the municipality determines and states in the ordinance that the establishment or use of the cemetery does not adversely affect public health, safety, and welfare. This subsection applies only to a municipality that: (1) is located in three or more counties; (2) has a population of 18,000 or more; and (3) does not have a cemetery within its boundaries, other than a family cemetery. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. * * * * *