Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB131 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 131
 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; March 7, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; March 7, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to cemeteries in certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 711.008, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (h) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsections (b), (f), (g), (h),
 and (k), an individual, corporation, partnership, firm, trust, or
 association may not establish or operate a cemetery, or use any land
 for the interment of remains, located:
 (1)  in or within one mile of the boundaries of a
 municipality with a population of 5,000 to 25,000;
 (2)  in or within two miles of the boundaries of a
 municipality with a population of 25,000 to 50,000;
 (3)  in or within three miles of the boundaries of a
 municipality with a population of 50,000 to 100,000;
 (4)  in or within four miles of the boundaries of a
 municipality with a population of 100,000 to 200,000; or
 (5)  in or within five miles of the boundaries of a
 municipality with a population of at least 200,000.
 (h)  Not later than September 1, 2014, a person may file a
 written application with the governing body of a municipality to
 establish or use a cemetery located inside the boundaries of the
 municipality.  The municipality by ordinance shall prescribe the
 information to be included in the application.  The governing body
 by ordinance may authorize the establishment or use of a cemetery
 located inside the boundaries of the municipality if the
 municipality determines and states in the ordinance that the
 establishment or use of the cemetery does not adversely affect
 public health, safety, and welfare.  This subsection applies only
 to a municipality that:
 (1)  is located in three or more counties;
 (2)  has a population of 18,000 or more; and
 (3)  does not have a cemetery within its boundaries,
 other than a family cemetery.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *