Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1311 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio, et al. S.B. No. 1311
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2011; March 16, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 12, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 12, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of certain highways as part of the
 Purple Heart Trail.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsections (a) and (c), Section 225.0225,
 Transportation Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The following highways are designated as [part of
 Interstate Highway 35 located in Texas is] the Texas portion of the
 national Purple Heart Trail:
 (1)  the part of Interstate Highway 35 located in
 Texas;
 (2)  the part of Interstate Highway 40 located in
 Texas;
 (3)  the part of Interstate Highway 37 from Interstate
 Highway 35 to U.S. Highway 77;
 (4)  the part of U.S. Highway 77 from Interstate
 Highway 37 to State Highway 100;
 (5)  State Highway 100; and
 (6)  Park Road 100.
 (c)  The department shall erect a marker at locations [each
 end of the highway and at intermediate sites] along the trail
 [highway] that the department determines are appropriate.  [The
 intermediate sites may not be farther apart than 100 miles.]
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *