Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB132 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 132
 (In the Senate - Filed November 8, 2010; January 31, 2011,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and
 Homeland Security; March 14, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 14, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to registration with the Selective Service System of
 certain applicants for a driver's license or personal
 identification certificate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 521.147, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 521.147.  [OPTIONAL] REGISTRATION WITH SELECTIVE
 SERVICE SYSTEM.  (a)  After an application for an original,
 renewal, or duplicate driver's license or personal identification
 certificate is submitted by a male applicant who on the date of the
 application is at least 18 years of age but younger than 26 years of
 age, the department shall send in an electronic format to the United
 States Selective Service System the information from the
 application necessary to register the applicant under the Military
 Selective Service Act (50 U.S.C. App. Section 451 et seq.).
 (b)  An application under this section must give written
 notice to an applicant that the application also constitutes
 registration with the United States Selective Service System for
 persons who are subject to registration and have not previously
 registered.  The notice must be conspicuous on the application and
 state:  "By submitting this application, I am consenting to
 registration with the United States Selective Service System if my
 registration is required by federal law."
 (c)  The applicant's submission of the application following
 this notification constitutes the applicant's consent to the
 sending of the information and the [The department shall develop by
 rule a selective service consent statement as a part of the
 application for an original, renewal, or duplicate driver's license
 or personal identification certificate. The consent statement must
 include a place to indicate consent or declination to register with
 the United States Selective Service System and must state the
 benefits and penalties associated with consent or declination to
 register. The department shall present the statement to each
 applicant who is subject to registration with the Selective Service
 System and record the applicant's response. A response is required
 to complete the application for a license or certificate for such an
 applicant. The department shall forward to the Selective Service
 System, in an electronic format, only the information necessary for
 registration of an applicant consenting to] registration.
 (d) [(b)]  In addition to the notification [statement]
 required by Subsection (b) [(a)], the department may conspicuously
 post at each location where applications for driver's licenses and
 personal identification certificates are accepted one or more
 signs, in English and Spanish, providing the information contained
 in the notification [statement].
 (e)  Subsections (a) and (c) do not apply to an applicant
 concerning whom the department has previously sent information to
 the Selective Service System.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an application for the
 issuance of a driver's license or personal identification
 certificate submitted on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *