Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1328 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1328
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 26, 2011,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 26, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1328 By:  Gallegos


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to optional dispute resolution methods regarding
 educational services for students with a disability, including
 individualized education program facilitation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 29.019 and 29.020 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.019.  OPTIONAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION.  (a)  The agency
 and each school district shall provide information to parents
 regarding optional dispute resolution methods that may be used when
 a dispute arises between the district and a parent of a student with
 a disability. The information:
 (1)  must be included with other information provided
 to the parent of a student with a disability; and
 (2)  may be provided in a written or electronic format.
 (b)  Information provided by the agency under this section
 must indicate that individualized education program facilitation
 is an optional dispute resolution method that some districts may
 choose to provide on a voluntary basis.
 (c)  If a school district chooses to offer individualized
 education program facilitation as an optional dispute resolution
 method:
 (1)  the district may determine whether to offer
 facilitation through an independent facilitator, through a
 district employee serving as a facilitator, or through a
 combination of those methods;
 (2)  the information provided by the district under
 this section must include a description of any applicable
 procedures for requesting the facilitation; and
 (3)  the facilitation must be provided at no cost to a
 parent.
 (d)  The use or availability of an optional dispute
 resolution method, including individualized education program
 facilitation, may not in any manner be used to deny or delay the
 right to pursue a special education complaint, mediation, or due
 process hearing in accordance with federal law.
 (e)  The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section.
 Sec. 29.020.  INDEPENDENT INDIVIDUALIZED EDUCATION PROGRAM
 FACILITATION.  (a)  The agency shall develop criteria and
 procedures in accordance with this section applicable to
 independent individualized education program facilitation provided
 by the agency or a school district or regional education service
 center. If the agency or a school district or regional education
 service center chooses to provide independent individualized
 education program facilitation, the facilitation must comply with
 the criteria and procedures developed under this section.
 (b)  The criteria and procedures must include:
 (1)  a definition of independent individualized
 education program facilitation;
 (2)  forms for implementing independent individualized
 education program facilitation;
 (3)  training requirements for independent
 facilitators; and
 (4)  an evaluation process through which information
 may be collected regarding the implementation and effectiveness of
 independent individualized education program facilitation provided
 by the agency or a school district or regional education service
 center.
 (c)  If the commissioner determines that adequate funding is
 available, the commissioner may authorize the use of state or
 federal funds to assist school districts and regional education
 service centers in providing independent individualized education
 program facilitation.
 (d)  Each regional education service center shall maintain a
 list of independent facilitators who meet the criteria described by
 Subsection (b)(3) and make the list available to school districts
 and parents who choose to use independent individualized education
 program facilitation.
 (e)  The commissioner shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement this section.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than January 1, 2013, the Texas
 Education Agency shall submit a report to the legislature regarding
 the implementation and effectiveness of individualized education
 program facilitation, including facilitation provided by an
 independent facilitator and facilitation provided by a school
 district employee acting as a facilitator.
 SECTION 3.  This Act applies beginning with the 2011-2012
 school year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *