Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1349 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 1349
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 6, 2011,
 reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 6, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that a person hold a license issued by the
 appropriate state agency to be employed as a marriage and family
 therapist by a school district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 21.003, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as otherwise provided by this subsection, a [A]
 person may not be employed by a school district as an audiologist,
 occupational therapist, physical therapist, physician, nurse,
 school psychologist, associate school psychologist, marriage and
 family therapist, social worker, or speech language pathologist
 unless the person is licensed by the state agency that licenses that
 profession and[. A person] may perform specific services within
 those professions for a school district only if the person holds the
 appropriate credential from the appropriate state agency. As long
 as a person employed by a district before September 1, 2011, to
 perform marriage and family therapy services is employed by the
 same district, the person is not required to hold a license as a
 marriage and family therapist to perform marriage and family
 therapy services with that district.
 SECTION 2.  Section 502.004, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 502.004.  APPLICATION OF CHAPTER. This chapter does
 not apply to:
 (1)  the activities, within the scope of a person's
 employment, of a person employed to perform marriage and family
 therapy by a federal, state, county, or municipal agency or, except
 as provided by Section 21.003(b), Education Code, by a public or
 private educational institution[, if the activities are within the
 scope of the person's employment];
 (2)  the activities of a student, intern, or trainee in
 marriage and family therapy in a recognized course of study in
 marriage and family therapy at an accredited institution of higher
 education or other training institution, if:
 (A)  the activities constitute a part of the
 course of study; and
 (B)  the person is called a "marriage and family
 therapist intern" or similar title;
 (3)  the activities and services of a person licensed
 to practice another profession, including a physician, attorney,
 registered nurse, occupational therapist, psychologist, social
 worker, or licensed professional counselor; or
 (4)  the activities and services of a recognized
 religious practitioner, including a pastoral counselor or
 Christian Science practitioner recognized by the Church of Christ
 Scientist as registered and published in the Christian Science
 Journal, if the practitioner practices marriage and family therapy
 in a manner consistent with the laws of this state.
 SECTION 3.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the State Board for Educator Certification shall
 propose rules for the administration of Subsection (b), Section
 21.003, Education Code, as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *