Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1356 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Estes S.B. No. 1356
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural
 Affairs; April 13, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 3, Nays 0; April 13, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the repeal of certain laws regulating the registration
 of animal tattoo marks with the Department of Public Safety of the
 State of Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 144, Agriculture Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  The repeal by this Act of Subchapter E, Chapter
 144, Agriculture Code, does not affect the validity of a
 certificate of registration issued under that subchapter before the
 effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *