Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1385 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 1385
 (In the Senate - Filed March 9, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 14, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 14, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the chief appraiser of an appraisal
 district or the collector for a taxing unit to waive penalties for
 failing to file certain documents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 23, Tax Code, is amended by
 adding Section 23.129 to read as follows:
 Sec. 23.129.  WAIVER OF CERTAIN PENALTIES. (a)  Subject to
 Subsection (b):
 (1)  a chief appraiser may waive a penalty imposed by
 Section 23.121(k), 23.1241(j), or 23.127(k); and
 (2)  a collector may waive a penalty imposed by Section
 23.122(n), 23.1242(m), or 23.128(m).
 (b)  A chief appraiser or collector may waive a penalty under
 Subsection (a) only if:
 (1)  the taxpayer seeking the waiver files a written
 application for the waiver with the chief appraiser or collector,
 as applicable, not later than the 30th day after the date the
 declaration or statement, as applicable, was required to be filed;
 (2)  the taxpayer's failure to file or failure to timely
 file the declaration or statement was a result of:
 (A)  a natural disaster that made it effectively
 impossible for the taxpayer to comply with the filing requirement;
 or
 (B)  an event beyond the control of the taxpayer
 that destroyed the taxpayer's property or records; and
 (3)  the taxpayer is otherwise in compliance with this
 chapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *