Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1424 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Wentworth S.B. No. 1424
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services;
 May 6, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; May 6, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of cease and desist orders by the Texas
 Medical Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 165.052, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  If it appears to the board that a person who is not
 licensed under this subtitle is violating this subtitle, a rule
 adopted under this subtitle, or another state statute or rule
 relating to the practice of medicine, the board [after notice and
 opportunity for a hearing] may issue a cease and desist order
 prohibiting the person from engaging in the activity.  Before
 issuing the order, the board must provide the person with the same
 notice and the same opportunity for an informal proceeding and a
 formal hearing as provided to a license holder under Chapter 164.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a hearing for which notice is provided under Section 165.052,
 Occupations Code, on or after the effective date of this Act.  A
 hearing for which notice is provided before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect when the notice is
 provided, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *