Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB144 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 144


 AN ACT
 relating to allowing a person who successfully completes a term of
 deferred adjudication community supervision to be eligible for a
 pardon.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 48.01, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 48.01.  GOVERNOR MAY PARDON. (a) In all criminal
 cases, except treason and impeachment, the Governor shall have
 power, after conviction or successful completion of a term of
 deferred adjudication community supervision, on the written signed
 recommendation and advice of the Board of Pardons and Paroles, or a
 majority thereof, to grant reprieves and commutations of
 punishments and pardons; and upon the written recommendation and
 advice of a majority of the Board of Pardons and Paroles, he shall
 have the power to remit fines and forfeitures. The Governor shall
 have the power to grant one reprieve in any capital case for a
 period not to exceed 30 days; and he shall have power to revoke
 conditional pardons. With the advice and consent of the
 Legislature, the Governor may grant reprieves, commutations of
 punishment and pardons in cases of treason.
 (b)  The Board of Pardons and Paroles may recommend that the
 Governor grant a pardon to a person who:
 (1)  is placed on deferred adjudication community
 supervision under Section 5, Article 42.12, and subsequently
 receives a discharge and dismissal under Section 5(c) of that
 article; and
 (2)  on or after the 10th anniversary of the date of
 discharge and dismissal, submits a written request to the board for
 a recommendation under this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2012, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 82nd Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2011, authorizing the governor to grant a pardon
 to a person who successfully completes a term of deferred
 adjudication community supervision is approved by the voters. If
 that amendment is not approved by the voters, this Act has no
 effect.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 144 passed the Senate on
 March 23, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2011, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 26, 2011, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2011, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 144 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 26, 2011, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2011, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 145, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor