Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1476 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Hegar S.B. No. 1476
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 March 30, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; March 30, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the minimum continuing legal education requirements for
 an attorney employed in the executive branch of state government.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 81.113, Government Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsection (b), the state bar
 shall credit an attorney licensed in this state with meeting the
 minimum continuing legal education requirements of the state bar
 for a reporting year if during the reporting year the attorney is
 employed full-time as an attorney by:
 (1)  the senate;
 (2)  the house of representatives;
 (3)  a committee, division, department, or office of
 the senate or house;
 (4)  the Texas Legislative Council;
 (5)  the Legislative Budget Board;
 (6)  the Legislative Reference Library;
 (7)  the office of the state auditor; [or]
 (8)  the Sunset Advisory Commission; or
 (9)  a board, commission, department, agency, office,
 or other entity in the executive branch of this state's government.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a continuing legal education compliance year that ends on or
 after September 1, 2012. The requirements for continuing legal
 education for a compliance year that ends before September 1, 2012,
 are covered by the law and rules in effect when the compliance year
 ended, and those laws and rules are continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *