Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1477 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hegar S.B. No. 1477
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; April 12, 2011, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays
 0; April 12, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1477 By:  Rodriguez


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to differential pay and benefits for certain officers and
 employees of emergency services districts who are members of the
 armed forces.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 775, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 775.039 to read as follows:
 Sec. 775.039.  DIFFERENTIAL PAY AND BENEFITS FOR OFFICERS
 AND EMPLOYEES OF EMERGENCY SERVICES DISTRICTS. (a)  A board may
 provide differential pay to a district officer or employee who is a
 member of the state military forces or a reserve component of the
 United States armed forces who is called to active duty if:
 (1)  the board adopts a policy providing for
 differential pay for all similarly situated officers or employees;
 and
 (2)  the officer's or employee's military pay is less
 than the officer's or employee's gross pay from the district.
 (b)  The combination of differential pay and military pay may
 not exceed the officer's or employee's actual gross pay from the
 district.
 (c)  For purposes of this section, military pay does not
 include money the officer or employee receives:
 (1)  for service in a combat zone;
 (2)  as hardship pay; or
 (3)  for being separated from the officer's or
 employee's family.
 (d)  The differential pay provided by Subsection (a) begins
 when the benefits allowed under Section 431.005, Government Code,
 are exhausted and continues until the officer's or employee's
 active military duty terminates.
 (e)  The board may extend the insurance benefits provided by
 the district to a district officer or employee who is a member of
 the state military forces or a reserve component of the United
 States armed forces who is called to active duty and to the
 officer's or employee's dependents. The extension period begins
 when the benefits allowed under Section 431.005, Government Code,
 are exhausted and continues until the officer's or employee's
 active military duty terminates.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *