Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1511 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: West S.B. No. 1511
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 22, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Education; April 20, 2011,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 20, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1511 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to minimum standards for approval of educator preparation
 programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.044, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 21.044.  EDUCATOR PREPARATION. (a)  The board shall
 propose rules establishing the training requirements a person must
 accomplish to obtain a certificate, enter an internship, or enter
 an induction-year program. The board shall propose rules
 specifying [specify] the minimum academic qualifications required
 for a certificate.
 (b)  In addition to satisfying applicable requirements and
 meeting applicable qualifications established under Subsection
 (a), to obtain a classroom teaching certificate, including a
 certificate qualifying a person to teach career and technical or
 special education classes, unless a certificate is awarded under
 Subsection (c), a person must:
 (1)  maintain an overall grade point average of at
 least 2.5 on a four-point scale or the equivalent while enrolled in
 an educator preparation program; or
 (2)  earn a grade point average of at least 2.5 on a
 four-point scale or the equivalent for the last 60 semester credit
 hours attempted at a public or private institution of higher
 education.
 (c)  Based on extraordinary circumstances, as determined by
 the board in accordance with board rule, the board may award a
 certificate to a person who would be eligible for a certificate if
 not for the person's failure to satisfy a grade point average
 requirement as specified under Subsection (b)(1) or (2). In any
 year, the board may not award certificates under this subsection to
 more than five percent of an educator preparation program's
 candidates for certification for that year.
 (d)  An educator preparation program may impose requirements
 or qualifications in addition to requirements and qualifications
 established under this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 21.045, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  The performance standards under Subsection (c) must
 include a requirement that an educator preparation program,
 including an undergraduate, alternative certification, or
 postbaccalaureate program, admit only an applicant for admission
 who:
 (1)  has, except as provided by Subsection (e):
 (A)  maintained an overall grade point average of
 at least 2.5 on a four-point scale or the equivalent on any course
 work previously attempted at a public or private institution of
 higher education; or
 (B)  earned a grade point average of at least 2.5
 on a four-point scale or the equivalent for the last 60 semester
 credit hours attempted at a public or private institution of higher
 education;
 (2)  demonstrates, in a manner determined by the
 board, basic skills in reading, writing, and mathematics;
 (3)  has successfully completed at least 18 semester
 credit hours in the subject-specific content area in which the
 applicant is pursuing certification; and
 (4)  if the applicant is seeking initial certification,
 has achieved a satisfactory level of performance on a content
 certification examination, which may be a content certification
 examination administered by a vendor approved by the commissioner
 for purposes of administering such an examination for the year for
 which the applicant is applying for admission to the program.
 (e)  The performance standards under Subsection (c) must
 permit an educator preparation program to admit an applicant who
 fails to satisfy a grade point average requirement prescribed by
 Subsection (d)(1)(A) or (B), provided that:
 (1)  not more than five percent of the total number of
 applicants admitted to the program in a year fail to satisfy the
 requirement under Subsection (d)(1)(A) or (B); and
 (2)  for each applicant admitted as described by this
 subsection, the director of the program:
 (A)  determines, based on documentation provided
 by the applicant, that the applicant's work, business, or career
 experience demonstrates achievement; and
 (B)  maintains and makes available at the request
 of the board the documentation provided under Paragraph (A).
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (a), Section 21.048, Education Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The board shall propose rules prescribing comprehensive
 examinations for each class of certificate issued by the board.  The
 board shall determine the satisfactory level of performance
 required for each certification examination.  The board shall
 require a satisfactory level of examination performance in English
 language arts, reading, mathematics, science, and social studies
 for the issuance of a generalist or multi-subject certificate.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter A, Chapter 21, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 21.008 to read as follows:
 Sec. 21.008.  BIENNIAL REPORT ON EDUCATORS. (a)  Not later
 than December 1 of each even-numbered year, the agency shall
 prepare, publish, and submit to the legislature a report regarding
 public school staffing and the working conditions for public school
 educators.  The report also shall be posted on the agency's Internet
 website.
 (b)  The report must contain, at a minimum, the following
 staffing information for each public school campus:
 (1)  the percentage of teachers assigned to teach
 subjects outside the teacher's area of certification or expertise;
 (2)  the percentage of teachers employed under
 emergency certificates;
 (3)  teacher turnover rates; and
 (4)  the number and percentage of teachers who have
 less than one year of teaching experience.
 (c)  The report must contain information regarding working
 conditions in each school district based on a statewide survey
 conducted by the agency of educators.  To encourage the uninhibited
 participation of educators, the survey must be designed to prevent
 the disclosure of the identity of a survey participant.  The agency
 shall include in the report recommendations for improving the
 working conditions at campuses identified by the agency, based on
 the results of the survey, as having poor working conditions.
 (d)  The commissioner is directed to seek private funding for
 the creation, implementation, and analysis of the survey.
 Implementation of this section is contingent upon securing funding.
 SECTION 5.  Sections 21.044 and 21.045, Education Code, as
 amended by this Act, apply only to a person admitted to an educator
 preparation program on or after January 1, 2012.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *