Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1534 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1534


 AN ACT
 relating to the operation, certification, and accountability of
 career schools or colleges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.0904, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0904.  REVIEW OF INSTITUTIONAL GROUPINGS.  (a)  At
 least once every 10 years, the board shall conduct a review of the
 institutional groupings under the board's higher education
 accountability system, including a review of the criteria for and
 definitions assigned to those groupings.
 (b)  The board shall include within the board's higher
 education accountability system any career schools and colleges in
 this state that offer degree programs. Regardless of whether the
 board is conducting a periodic review of institutional groupings as
 required by Subsection (a), the board shall determine whether to
 create one or more separate institutional groupings for entities to
 which this subsection applies. In implementing this subsection,
 the board shall:
 (1)  consult with affected career schools and colleges
 regarding the imposition of reporting requirements on those
 entities; and
 (2)  adopt rules that clearly define the types and
 amounts of information to be reported to the board.
 (c)  In advance of each regular session of the legislature,
 the board shall report to each standing legislative committee with
 primary jurisdiction over higher education regarding any entities
 to which Subsection (b) applies that do not participate in the
 board's higher education accountability system as provided by that
 subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Subdivisions (1) and (4), Section 132.001,
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (1)  "Career school or college":
 (A)  means any business enterprise operated for a
 profit or on a nonprofit basis that maintains a physical place of
 business within this state or solicits business within this state,
 that is not specifically exempted by this chapter, and:
 (i) [(A)]  that offers or maintains a course
 or courses of instruction or study; or
 (ii) [(B)]  at which place of business such
 a course or courses of instruction or study are available through
 classroom instruction or by distance education, or both, to a
 person for the purpose of training or preparing the person for a
 field of endeavor in a business, trade, technical, or industrial
 occupation, or for avocational or personal improvement; and
 (B)  does not include a school or educational
 institution that:
 (i)  is physically located in another state;
 (ii)  is legally authorized by the state of
 its physical location to offer postsecondary education and award
 degrees;
 (iii)  is accredited by a regional or
 national accrediting organization recognized by the United States
 secretary of education under the Higher Education Act of 1965 (20
 U.S.C. Section 1001 et seq.); and
 (iv)  offers in this state only
 postsecondary distance or correspondence programs of instruction.
 (4)  "Representative" means a person employed by a
 career school or college[, whether the school or college is located
 within or without this state,] to act as an agent, solicitor,
 broker, or independent contractor to directly procure students for
 the school or college by solicitation within [or without] this
 state at any place.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 132.052 and 132.151, Education Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 132.052.  APPLICATION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPROVAL.
 Every career school or college desiring to operate in this state [or
 do business in this state] shall make written application to the
 commission for a certificate of approval. Such application shall
 be verified, be in such form as may be prescribed by the commission,
 and shall furnish the commission such information as the commission
 may require.
 Sec. 132.151.  PROHIBITIONS. A person may not:
 (1)  operate a career school or college without a
 certificate of approval issued by the commission;
 (2)  solicit prospective students for or on behalf of a
 career school or college without being registered as a
 representative of the career school or college as required by this
 chapter;
 (3)  accept contracts or enrollment applications for or
 on behalf of a career school or college from a representative who is
 not bonded as required by this chapter;
 (4)  utilize advertising designed to mislead or deceive
 prospective students;
 (5)  fail to notify the commission of the closure
 [discontinuance of the operation] of any career school or college
 within 72 hours of cessation of classes and make available accurate
 records as required by this chapter;
 (6)  negotiate any promissory instrument received as
 payment of tuition or other charge by a career school or college
 prior to completion of 75 percent of the applicable program,
 provided that prior to such time, the instrument may be transferred
 by assignment to a purchaser who shall be subject to all the
 defenses available against the career school or college named as
 payee; or
 (7)  violate any provision of this chapter.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter G, Chapter 132, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 132.202 to read as follows:
 Sec. 132.202.  REQUIRED POSTING BY CERTAIN SCHOOLS OR
 EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS NOT OPERATING IN THIS STATE. A school or
 educational institution described by Section 132.001(1)(B) shall
 post a conspicuous notice on the home page of its website stating:
 (1)  that the career school or college is not regulated
 in Texas under this chapter;
 (2)  the name of any regulatory agencies that approve
 and regulate the school's programs in the state where the school is
 physically located and in which it has legal authorization to
 operate; and
 (3)  how to file complaints or make other contact with
 applicable regulatory agencies.
 SECTION 5.  Subsection (d), Section 132.059, Education Code,
 is repealed.
 SECTION 6.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a certificate of approval issued, an action filed, or any other
 proceeding commenced under Chapter 132, Education Code, on or after
 the effective date of this Act. A certificate of approval issued,
 an action filed, or any other proceeding commenced before the
 effective date of this Act is covered by the law in effect at the
 time the certificate of approval was issued, the action was filed,
 or the other proceeding was commenced, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1534 passed the Senate on
 April 29, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 29, Nays 2;
 May 24, 2011, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 25, 2011, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2011, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 29,
 Nays 2.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1534 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 23, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 145,
 Nays 0, two present not voting; May 25, 2011, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 28, 2011, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor