82R9484 T By: Carona S.B. No. 1557 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the establishment of the Texas High Performance Schools Consortium. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 7.0561, Education Code, is added to read as follows: Sec. 7.0561. TEXAS HIGH PERFORMANCE SCHOOLS CONSORTIUM. (a) The Texas High Performance Schools Consortium is created for the purpose of informing the governor, legislature, and commissioner about ways to transform public schools to improve student learning through the development of innovative, next-generation learning standards and assessment and accountability systems. (b) One or more school districts, up to a maximum of 20, may apply to the commissioner to be included in the consortium of school districts. The districts selected shall include a representative range of district types and sizes and diverse student populations. The commissioner may select upon application an exemplary open-enrollment charter school to participate in the consortium. (c) The commissioner may waive one or more requirements, restrictions, or prohibitions under (1) Subchapter B, Chapter 28; (2) Sections 31.1011 and 31.073(b)(1) (state textbook credits); and (3) Chapter 39. (d) With input from interested school districts and other stakeholders, the commissioner shall adopt rules to create the consortium, according to the following principles for a next generation of higher performing public schools: (1) engagement of students in digital learning, including the use of electronic textbooks and instructional materials adopted under Subchapters B and B-1, Chapter 31, and courses offered through the state virtual school network under Subchapter 30A; (2) emphasis on learning standards that focus on high–priority "power standards" identified in coordination with districts participating in the consortium; (3) use of multiple assessments for learning that have meaning and importance and that continuously inform students, parents, campuses, and districts about the extent to which learning is occurring and what schools are doing to improve; (4) an effective and efficient accountability system that: (A) balances academic excellence and local values to inspire learning; and (B) at the state level, uses a stratified random sampling of students or other objective methodology to hold districts and schools accountable while reducing the number of state assessments that students are required to take; and (5) local control that enables communities and parents to be involved in the important decisions regarding the education of their children. (e) The application shall include a detailed plan for assessments and accountability, which will both support improved instruction and learning and provide evidence of the accurate evaluation of the quality of the campuses, and which shall include: (1) a thorough plan for accountability for student learning, including issues regarding compliance with federal law; (2) clear descriptions of each assessed curricular aim in the "power standards"; (3) a plan for resources to support teachers in improving student learning; and (4) other provisions that may be established by the commissioner. (f) The commissioner shall convene consortium leaders periodically to discuss ways to transform learning opportunities for all students, build cross-district support systems and training, and share best practice tools and processes. (g) The commissioner or a school district that participates in the consortium may accept gifts, grants, or donations from any source, including a foundation, private entity, or governmental entity for the implementation of this section. (h) To cover administration costs, the commissioner may charge a fee to a school district or open-enrollment charter school that is selected to participate in the consortium. SECTION 2. (a) The commissioner shall adopt rules under Section 7.0561, Education Code, as added by this Act, not later than December 1, 2011. The commissioner shall seek a federal waiver, if needed, for implementation. (b) The commissioner shall make the application available not later than January 1, 2012, for school districts to apply not later than March 1, 2012 and to begin the consortium not later than the 2012-13 school year. (c) With the assistance of the consortium, the commissioner shall submit progress reports to the Legislature by December 1, 2012, and December 1, 2014. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2011.