Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1557 Engrossed / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 1557


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Texas High Performance Schools Consortium.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 7, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 7.0561 to read as follows:
 Sec. 7.0561.  TEXAS HIGH PERFORMANCE SCHOOLS CONSORTIUM.
 (a)  In this section, "consortium" means the Texas High Performance
 Schools Consortium established under this section.
 (b)  The Texas High Performance Schools Consortium is
 established to inform the governor, legislature, and commissioner
 concerning methods for transforming public schools in this state by
 improving student learning through the development of innovative,
 next-generation learning standards and assessment and
 accountability systems.
 (c)  From among school districts and eligible
 open-enrollment charter schools that apply using the form and in
 the time and manner established by commissioner rule, the
 commissioner may select not more than 20 participants for the
 consortium. The districts selected by the commissioner must
 represent a range of district types, sizes, and diverse student
 populations, as determined by the commissioner in accordance with
 commissioner rule. To be eligible to participate in the
 consortium, an open-enrollment charter school must have been
 awarded an exemplary distinction designation under Subchapter G,
 Chapter 39, during the preceding school year.
 (d)  The number of students enrolled in consortium
 participants may not be greater than a number equal to five percent
 of the total number of students enrolled in public schools in this
 state according to the most recent agency data.
 (e)  The application process under Subsection (c) must
 require school districts and open-enrollment charter schools
 applying to participate in the consortium to submit a detailed plan
 designed to both support improved instruction of and learning by
 students and provide evidence of the accurate assessment of the
 quality of learning on campuses. The plan submitted by a school
 district may designate the entire district or one or more district
 campuses as proposed consortium participants.  The plan submitted
 by a district or open-enrollment charter school must include:
 (1)  a clear description of each assessed curricular
 goal included in the learning standards adopted in accordance with
 Subsection (f)(2);
 (2)  a plan for acquiring resources to support teachers
 in improving student learning;
 (3)  a description of any waiver of an applicable
 prohibition, requirement, or restriction the district or charter
 school would want to apply for; and
 (4)  any other provisions required by the commissioner.
 (f)  In consultation with interested school districts,
 open-enrollment charter schools, and other appropriate interested
 persons, the commissioner shall adopt rules applicable to the
 consortium, according to the following principles for a next
 generation of higher performing public schools:
 (1)  engagement of students in digital learning,
 including engagement through the use of electronic textbooks and
 instructional materials adopted under Subchapters B and B-1,
 Chapter 31, and courses offered through the state virtual school
 network under Subchapter 30A;
 (2)  emphasis on learning standards that focus on
 high-priority standards identified in coordination with districts
 and charter schools participating in the consortium;
 (3)  use of multiple assessments of learning capable of
 being used to inform students, parents, districts, and charter
 schools on an ongoing basis concerning the extent to which learning
 is occurring and the actions consortium participants are taking to
 improve learning; and
 (4)  reliance on local control that enables communities
 and parents to be involved in the important decisions regarding the
 education of their children.
 (g)  The commissioner shall convene consortium leaders
 periodically to discuss methods to transform learning
 opportunities for all students, build cross-district and
 cross-school support systems and training, and share best practices
 tools and processes.
 (h)  The commissioner or a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school participating in the consortium
 may, for purposes of this section, accept gifts, grants, or
 donations from any source, including a private entity or
 governmental entity.
 (i)  To cover the costs of administering the consortium, the
 commissioner may charge a fee to a school district or
 open-enrollment charter school participating in the consortium.
 (j)  With the assistance of the school districts and
 open-enrollment charter schools participating in the consortium,
 the commissioner shall submit reports concerning the performance
 and progress of the consortium to the governor and the legislature
 not later than December 1, 2012, and not later than December 1,
 2014. The report submitted not later than December 1, 2012, must
 include any recommendation by the commissioner concerning
 legislative authorization for the commissioner to waive a
 prohibition, requirement, or restriction that applies to a
 consortium participant. That report must also include a plan for an
 effective and efficient accountability system for consortium
 participants that balances academic excellence and local values to
 inspire learning and, at the state level, contingent on any
 necessary waiver of federal law, may incorporate use of a
 stratified random sampling of students or other objective
 methodology to hold consortium participants accountable while
 attempting to reduce the number of state assessment instruments
 that are required to be administered to students.  The commissioner
 shall seek a federal waiver, to any extent necessary, to prepare for
 implementation of the plan if enacted by the legislature.  This
 subsection expires January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  Not later than January 1, 2012, the
 commissioner of education shall adopt rules as required under
 Section 7.0561, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than March 1, 2012, the commissioner of
 education shall make available to school districts and
 open-enrollment charter schools the application forms required
 under Section 7.0561, Education Code, as added by this Act. The
 commissioner of education shall require school districts and
 open-enrollment charter schools that intend to apply to participate
 in the Texas High Performance Schools Consortium to submit
 applications not later than June 1, 2012.
 (c)  Not later than July 1, 2012, the commissioner of
 education shall formally select participants for the Texas High
 Performance Schools Consortium established under Section 7.0561,
 Education Code, as added by this Act.  The consortium must begin
 operating not later than the beginning of the 2012-2013 school
 year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.