Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1564 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1564
 (In the Senate - Filed March 10, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 26, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 26, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1564 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to developmental education courses and the assessment of
 student readiness under the Texas Success Initiative for public
 institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.3062, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (a-1), (i-2), (i-3), and (i-4) and amending
 Subsections (f), (i), and (k) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  In this section, "program evaluation" means a
 systematic method of collecting, analyzing, and using information
 to answer questions about developmental education courses,
 interventions, and policies, particularly about their
 effectiveness and cost-efficiency.
 (f)  Each assessment instrument designated by the board for
 use under this section must be diagnostic in nature and designed to
 assess a student's readiness to perform freshman-level academic
 coursework. The board shall prescribe a single standard or set of
 standards for each [the] assessment instrument to effectively
 measure student readiness as demonstrated by current research [or
 instruments that reflect that student readiness.    An institution of
 higher education may adopt more stringent assessment standards with
 respect to student readiness].
 (i)  The institution of higher education may refer a student
 to developmental coursework as considered necessary by the
 institution to address a student's deficiencies in the student's
 readiness to perform freshman-level academic coursework, except
 that the institution may not require enrollment in developmental
 coursework with respect to a student previously determined under
 Subsection (q-1) or determined by any institution of higher
 education to have met college-readiness standards. An institution
 that requires a student to enroll in developmental coursework must
 offer a range of developmental coursework, including online
 coursework, or instructional support that includes the integration
 of technology to efficiently address the particular developmental
 needs of the student.
 (i-2)  An institution of higher education must base
 developmental coursework on research-based best practices that
 include the following components:
 (1)  assessment;
 (2)  differentiated placement and instruction;
 (3)  faculty development;
 (4)  support services;
 (5)  program evaluation;
 (6)  integration of technology with an emphasis on
 instructional support programs;
 (7)  non-course-based developmental education
 interventions; and
 (8)  course pairing of developmental education courses
 with credit-bearing courses.
 (i-3)  The board shall adopt rules for the implementation of
 Subsection (i-2).
 (i-4)  The board, in consultation with institutions of
 higher education, shall develop and provide professional
 development programs, including instruction in differentiated
 instruction methods designed to address students' diverse learning
 needs, to faculty and staff who provide developmental coursework to
 students.
 (k)  An institution of higher education shall determine when
 a student is ready to perform freshman-level academic coursework.
 The institution must make its determination using learning outcomes
 for developmental education courses developed by the board based on
 established college and career readiness standards and student
 performance on one or more appropriate assessments [on an
 individual basis according to the needs of the student. The
 determination shall include:
 [(1)     requiring a student to retake a board-approved
 assessment instrument, if the student did not initially perform
 within a deviation established by the board; or
 [(2)     other board-approved means of evaluating student
 readiness, if the student did not initially pass the assessment
 instrument but performed within a deviation established by the
 board].
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (e), Section 51.3062, Education Code,
 is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies
 beginning with the 2012-2013 academic year.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *