Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1566 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            April 21, 2011      TO: Honorable Steve Ogden, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1566 by Uresti (Relating to the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants; providing penalties.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1566, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
April 21, 2011





  TO: Honorable Steve Ogden, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:SB1566 by Uresti (Relating to the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants; providing penalties.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Steve Ogden, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: SB1566 by Uresti (Relating to the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants; providing penalties.), As Introduced

 Honorable Steve Ogden, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance 

 Honorable Steve Ogden, Chair, Senate Committee on Finance 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

SB1566 by Uresti (Relating to the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants; providing penalties.), As Introduced

SB1566 by Uresti (Relating to the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants; providing penalties.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1566, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for SB1566, As Introduced: an impact of $0 through the biennium ending August 31, 2013.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2012 $0   2013 $0   2014 $0   2015 $0   2016 $0    


2012 $0
2013 $0
2014 $0
2015 $0
2016 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2011   2012 $48,402 ($48,402) 0.5   2013 $31,503 ($31,503) 0.5   2014 $31,503 ($31,503) 0.5   2015 $31,503 ($31,503) 0.5   2016 $31,503 ($31,503) 0.5   

  Fiscal Year Probable Revenue Gain fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Probable (Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2011   2012 $48,402 ($48,402) 0.5   2013 $31,503 ($31,503) 0.5   2014 $31,503 ($31,503) 0.5   2015 $31,503 ($31,503) 0.5   2016 $31,503 ($31,503) 0.5  


2012 $48,402 ($48,402) 0.5
2013 $31,503 ($31,503) 0.5
2014 $31,503 ($31,503) 0.5
2015 $31,503 ($31,503) 0.5
2016 $31,503 ($31,503) 0.5

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would amend the Occupations Code relating to the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants; providing penalties.  The bill would create the Texas Anesthesiologist Assistant Board (board) to advise the Texas Medical Board (TMB), and would specify the board's composition, member eligibility standards and terms, and meeting requirements. Board members would not receive compensation, but they would be eligible to receive reimbursement under the General Appropriations Act for transportation and related expenses while conducting board business. TMB would provide administrative and clerical employees to assist the board. The bill would require anesthesiologist assistants to hold a license issued by the board, and would establish the eligibility, examination, and continuing education requirements.  TMB estimates 50 applicants will apply for licensure in the initial implementation year and 10 in each subsequent year.        The bill would define the scope of practice and supervision requirements for anesthesiologist assistants. The board would adopt rules for the performance of its duties, including licensing and the assessment of fees. TMB would adopt rules with the advice of the board, and set fees to administer and enforce the new chapter. The bill would provide for an administrative penalty, not to exceed $2,000 each day a violation continued, and a criminal penalty that would be a third degree felony.  This bill would take effect September 1, 2011, except for provisions relating to anesthesiologist assistant license requirements and criminal penalties which take effect September 1, 2012. 

The bill would amend the Occupations Code relating to the licensure of anesthesiologist assistants; providing penalties.  The bill would create the Texas Anesthesiologist Assistant Board (board) to advise the Texas Medical Board (TMB), and would specify the board's composition, member eligibility standards and terms, and meeting requirements. Board members would not receive compensation, but they would be eligible to receive reimbursement under the General Appropriations Act for transportation and related expenses while conducting board business. TMB would provide administrative and clerical employees to assist the board.

The bill would require anesthesiologist assistants to hold a license issued by the board, and would establish the eligibility, examination, and continuing education requirements.  TMB estimates 50 applicants will apply for licensure in the initial implementation year and 10 in each subsequent year.       

The bill would define the scope of practice and supervision requirements for anesthesiologist assistants. The board would adopt rules for the performance of its duties, including licensing and the assessment of fees. TMB would adopt rules with the advice of the board, and set fees to administer and enforce the new chapter.

The bill would provide for an administrative penalty, not to exceed $2,000 each day a violation continued, and a criminal penalty that would be a third degree felony. 

This bill would take effect September 1, 2011, except for provisions relating to anesthesiologist assistant license requirements and criminal penalties which take effect September 1, 2012. 

Methodology

TMB anticipates additional costs associated with the implementation of the bill.  TMB estimates the need for a 0.5 FTE Program Specialist I at a cost of $18,326 per year to process applications and to assist with board meetings; $4,000/meeting for an estimated two board meetings per year; $14,500 in fiscal year 2012 to reconfigure its current cubicle workstations in order to accomodate the additional 0.5 FTE;   $7,500 per year for travel expenses and $500 per year for supplies/equipment costs for six board members.    Total impact is estimated to be $48,402 in fiscal year 2012 and $31,503 in each subsequent year. Based on the analysis of the agency, it is assumed that the Board would adjust license fees to cover any additional costs associated with the implementation of the bill.

TMB anticipates additional costs associated with the implementation of the bill.  TMB estimates the need for a 0.5 FTE Program Specialist I at a cost of $18,326 per year to process applications and to assist with board meetings; $4,000/meeting for an estimated two board meetings per year; $14,500 in fiscal year 2012 to reconfigure its current cubicle workstations in order to accomodate the additional 0.5 FTE;   $7,500 per year for travel expenses and $500 per year for supplies/equipment costs for six board members.    Total impact is estimated to be $48,402 in fiscal year 2012 and $31,503 in each subsequent year.

Based on the analysis of the agency, it is assumed that the Board would adjust license fees to cover any additional costs associated with the implementation of the bill.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 503 Texas Medical Board

304 Comptroller of Public Accounts, 503 Texas Medical Board

LBB Staff: JOB, KK, MW, NV, CL

 JOB, KK, MW, NV, CL