Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1574 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1574
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Economic Development;
 May 11, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 11, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1574 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of money in a tax increment fund to pay costs
 related to public improvements used for social services programs
 that promote the development or redevelopment of a reinvestment
 zone.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 311.008, Tax Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A municipality or county may exercise any power
 necessary and convenient to carry out this chapter, including the
 power to:
 (1)  cause project plans to be prepared, approve and
 implement the plans, and otherwise achieve the purposes of the
 plan;
 (2)  acquire real property by purchase, condemnation,
 or other means to implement project plans and sell that property on
 the terms and conditions and in the manner it considers advisable;
 (3)  enter into agreements, including agreements with
 bondholders, determined by the governing body of the municipality
 or county to be necessary or convenient to implement project plans
 and achieve their purposes, which agreements may include
 conditions, restrictions, or covenants that run with the land or
 that by other means regulate or restrict the use of land; and
 (4)  consistent with the project plan for the zone:
 (A)  acquire blighted, deteriorated,
 deteriorating, undeveloped, or inappropriately developed real
 property or other property in a blighted area or in a federally
 assisted new community in the zone for the preservation or
 restoration of historic sites, beautification or conservation, the
 provision of public works or public facilities, or other public
 purposes;
 (B)  acquire, construct, reconstruct, or install
 public works, facilities, or sites or other public improvements,
 including utilities, streets, street lights, water and sewer
 facilities, pedestrian malls and walkways, parks, flood and
 drainage facilities, or parking facilities, but not including
 educational facilities; [or]
 (C)  in a reinvestment zone created on or before
 September 1, 1999, acquire, construct, or reconstruct educational
 facilities in the municipality; or
 (D)  in a reinvestment zone created in a county
 that has a population of less than 1.5 million but in which a
 municipality is primarily located that has a population of at least
 775,000, acquire, construct, reconstruct, renovate, rehabilitate,
 install, or equip public improvements used or to be used for social
 services programs in the zone, including improvements determined by
 the municipality or county to be beneficial to:
 (i)  providing basic necessities such as
 food, clothing, shelter, health care, and mental health care;
 (ii)  helping provide individuals and
 families a transition out of poverty by ensuring the availability
 of educational, employment, and other services that promote
 self-reliance;
 (iii)  preventing social problems through
 education, preventive physical and mental health programs, crime
 prevention programs, and other preventive programs;
 (iv)  providing family and societal support
 services, including education, child care, counseling and
 assistance for the aging, youth, the homeless, and the unemployed,
 rehabilitation services, and other similar support services; and
 (v)  encouraging personal development and
 community enrichment through cultural and educational programs.
 SECTION 2.  Section 311.010, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  An agreement under Subsection (b) relating to the
 project plan or the reinvestment zone financing plan for a
 reinvestment zone described by Section 311.008(b)(4)(D) may:
 (1)  during the term of the agreement dedicate, pledge,
 or otherwise provide for the use of revenue in the tax increment
 fund to pay project costs relating to the cost of public
 improvements described by Section 311.008(b)(4)(D); or
 (2)  dedicate revenue from the tax increment fund to
 pay the costs of operating or administering programs described by
 Section 311.008(b)(4)(D).
 (b-2)  A municipality or county may not use revenue from a
 tax increment fund dedicated, pledged, or otherwise provided for a
 purpose described by Subsection (b-1) to replace revenue the
 municipality or county would otherwise have spent from other
 sources for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *