Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB158 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 158


 AN ACT
 relating to offenses involving the fraudulent or unlawful
 obtaining, delivering, dispensing, distributing, or diverting of a
 controlled substance; providing penalties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 481, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 481.1285 to read as follows:
 Sec. 481.1285.  OFFENSE:  DIVERSION OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCE
 BY REGISTRANTS, DISPENSERS, AND CERTAIN OTHER PERSONS. (a)  This
 section applies only to a registrant, a dispenser, or a person who,
 pursuant to Section 481.062(a)(1) or (2), is not required to
 register under this subchapter.
 (b)  A person commits an offense if the person knowingly:
 (1)  converts to the person's own use or benefit a
 controlled substance to which the person has access by virtue of the
 person's profession or employment; or
 (2)  diverts to the unlawful use or benefit of another
 person a controlled substance to which the person has access by
 virtue of the person's profession or employment.
 (c)  An offense under Subsection (b)(1) is a state jail
 felony.  An offense under Subsection (b)(2) is a felony of the third
 degree.
 (d)  If conduct that constitutes an offense under this
 section also constitutes an offense under any other law, the actor
 may be prosecuted under this section, the other law, or both.
 SECTION 2.  Section 481.129, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsections (a-1) and (d-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  A person commits an offense if the person, with intent
 to obtain a controlled substance or combination of controlled
 substances that is not medically necessary for the person or an
 amount of a controlled substance or substances that is not
 medically necessary for the person, obtains or attempts to obtain
 from a practitioner a controlled substance or a prescription for a
 controlled substance by misrepresentation, fraud, forgery,
 deception, subterfuge, or concealment of a material fact.  For
 purposes of this subsection, a material fact includes whether the
 person has an existing prescription for a controlled substance
 issued for the same period of time by another practitioner.
 (d-1)  An offense under Subsection (a-1) is:
 (1)  a felony of the second degree if any controlled
 substance that is the subject of the offense is listed in Schedule I
 or II;
 (2)  a felony of the third degree if any controlled
 substance that is the subject of the offense is listed in Schedule
 III or IV; and
 (3)  a Class A misdemeanor if any controlled substance
 that is the subject of the offense is listed in Schedule V.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (a), Section 71.02, Penal Code, as
 amended by Chapters 153 (S.B. 2225), 1130 (H.B. 2086), and 1357
 (S.B. 554), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is
 reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person commits an offense if, with the intent to
 establish, maintain, or participate in a combination or in the
 profits of a combination or as a member of a criminal street gang,
 the person commits or conspires to commit one or more of the
 following:
 (1)  murder, capital murder, arson, aggravated
 robbery, robbery, burglary, theft, aggravated kidnapping,
 kidnapping, aggravated assault, aggravated sexual assault, sexual
 assault, forgery, deadly conduct, assault punishable as a Class A
 misdemeanor, burglary of a motor vehicle, or unauthorized use of a
 motor vehicle;
 (2)  any gambling offense punishable as a Class A
 misdemeanor;
 (3)  promotion of prostitution, aggravated promotion
 of prostitution, or compelling prostitution;
 (4)  unlawful manufacture, transportation, repair, or
 sale of firearms or prohibited weapons;
 (5)  unlawful manufacture, delivery, dispensation, or
 distribution of a controlled substance or dangerous drug, or
 unlawful possession of a controlled substance or dangerous drug
 through forgery, fraud, misrepresentation, or deception;
 (5-a)  causing the unlawful delivery, dispensation, or
 distribution of a controlled substance or dangerous drug in
 violation of Subtitle B, Title 3, Occupations Code;
 (6)  any unlawful wholesale promotion or possession of
 any obscene material or obscene device with the intent to wholesale
 promote the same;
 (7)  any offense under Subchapter B, Chapter 43,
 depicting or involving conduct by or directed toward a child
 younger than 18 years of age;
 (8)  any felony offense under Chapter 32;
 (9)  any offense under Chapter 36;
 (10)  any offense under Chapter 34 or 35;
 (11)  any offense under Section 37.11(a);
 (12)  any offense under Chapter 20A;
 (13)  any offense under Section 37.10; [or]
 (14)  any offense under Section 38.06, 38.07, 38.09, or
 38.11;
 (15) [(14)]  any offense under Section 42.10; or
 (16) [(14)]  any offense under Section 46.06(a)(1) or
 46.14.
 SECTION 4.  Subsections (b) and (c), Section 71.02, Penal
 Code, as amended by Chapters 761 (H.B. 354) and 900 (S.B. 1067),
 Acts of the 73rd Legislature, Regular Session, 1993, are reenacted
 to read as follows:
 (b)  Except as provided in Subsections (c) and (d), an
 offense under this section is one category higher than the most
 serious offense listed in Subsection (a) that was committed, and if
 the most serious offense is a Class A misdemeanor, the offense is a
 state jail felony, except that if the most serious offense is a
 felony of the first degree, the offense is a felony of the first
 degree.
 (c)  Conspiring to commit an offense under this section is of
 the same degree as the most serious offense listed in Subsection (a)
 that the person conspired to commit.
 SECTION 5.  Subsection (a), Section 71.05, Penal Code, as
 amended by Chapters 761 (H.B. 354) and 900 (S.B. 1067), Acts of the
 73rd Legislature, Regular Session, 1993, is reenacted and amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  It is an affirmative defense to prosecution under
 Section 71.02 that under circumstances manifesting a voluntary and
 complete renunciation of the actor's [his] criminal objective, the
 actor withdrew from the combination before commission of an offense
 listed in [Subsection (a) of] Section 71.02(a) [71.02] and took
 further affirmative action that prevented the commission of the
 offense.
 SECTION 6.  Subsection (c), Section 71.05, Penal Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Evidence that the defendant withdrew from the
 combination before commission of an offense listed in [Subdivisions
 (1) through (7) or Subdivision (10) of Subsection (a) of] Section
 71.02(a) [71.02 of this code] and made substantial effort to
 prevent the commission of an offense listed in [Subdivisions (1)
 through (7) or Subdivision (10) of Subsection (a) of] Section
 71.02(a) [71.02 of this code] shall be admissible as mitigation at
 the hearing on punishment if the actor [he] has been found guilty
 under Section 71.02 [of this code], and in the event of a finding of
 renunciation under this subsection, the punishment shall be one
 grade lower than that provided under Section 71.02 [of this code].
 SECTION 7.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 covered by the law in effect when the offense was committed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For purposes of
 this section, an offense was committed before the effective date of
 this Act if any element of the offense occurred before that date.
 SECTION 8.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails
 over another Act of the 82nd Legislature, Regular Session, 2011,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 9.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 158 passed the Senate on
 March 30, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 26, 2011, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2011, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 28, 2011, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 158 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 145,
 Nays 2, two present not voting; May 27, 2011, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 29, 2011, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 146, Nays 2, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor