Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1600 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1600


 AN ACT
 relating to the registration of peace officers as private security
 officers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1702.322, Occupations Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1702.322.  LAW ENFORCEMENT PERSONNEL. This chapter
 does not apply to:
 (1)  a person who has full-time employment as a peace
 officer and who receives compensation for private employment on an
 individual or an independent contractor basis as a patrolman,
 guard, extra job coordinator, or watchman if the officer:
 (A)  is employed in an employee-employer
 relationship or employed on an individual contractual basis:
 (i)  directly by the recipient of the
 services; or
 (ii)  by a company licensed under this
 chapter;
 (B)  is not in the employ of another peace
 officer;
 (C)  is not a reserve peace officer; and
 (D)  works as a peace officer on the average of at
 least 32 hours a week, is compensated by the state or a political
 subdivision of the state at least at the minimum wage, and is
 entitled to all employee benefits offered to a peace officer by the
 state or political subdivision;
 (2)  a reserve peace officer while the reserve officer
 is performing guard, patrolman, or watchman duties for a county and
 is being compensated solely by that county;
 (3)  a peace officer acting in an official capacity in
 responding to a burglar alarm or detection device; or
 (4)  a person engaged in the business of electronic
 monitoring of an individual as a condition of that individual's
 community supervision, parole, mandatory supervision, or release
 on bail, if the person does not perform any other service that
 requires a license under this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1600 passed the Senate on
 April 21, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 25, 2011, Senate refused to concur in House amendment and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 27, 2011, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 29, 2011, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1600 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, one present not voting; May 27, 2011, House granted request
 of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 29, 2011, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 134, Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor