Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1616 Comm Sub / Bill

                    By: West S.B. No. 1616
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 27, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 27, 2011,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1616 By:  Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the collection, storage, preservation, retrieval, and
 destruction of biological evidence.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 38.43, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 38.43.  [PRESERVATION OF] EVIDENCE CONTAINING
 BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL. (a)  In this article, "biological evidence"
 means:
 (1)  the contents of a sexual assault examination kit;
 or
 (2)  any item that contains blood, semen, hair, saliva,
 skin tissue, fingernail scrapings, bone, bodily fluids, or any
 other identifiable biological material that was collected as part
 of an investigation of an alleged felony offense or conduct
 constituting a felony offense that might reasonably be used to [In a
 criminal case in which a defendant is convicted, the attorney
 representing the state, a clerk, or any other officer in possession
 of evidence described by Subsection (b) shall ensure the
 preservation of the evidence.
 [(b)  This article applies to evidence that:
 [(1)     was in the possession of the state during the
 prosecution of the case; and
 [(2)     at the time of conviction was known to contain
 biological material that if subjected to scientific testing would
 more likely than not]:
 (A)  establish the identity of the person
 committing the offense or engaging in the conduct constituting the
 offense; or
 (B)  exclude a person from the group of persons
 who could have committed the offense or engaged in the conduct
 constituting the offense.
 (b)  This article applies to a governmental or public entity
 or an individual, including a law enforcement agency, prosecutor's
 office, court, public hospital, or crime laboratory, that is
 charged with the collection, storage, preservation, or retrieval of
 biological evidence.
 (c)  The Department of Public Safety shall adopt rules
 relating to a person that collects, stores, preserves, or retrieves
 any biological evidence in relation to an investigation or
 prosecution of a felony offense or conduct constituting a felony
 offense.  The rules adopted under this subsection must:
 (1)  require biological evidence to be retained for a
 felony offense or conduct constituting a felony offense under
 Chapter 19, 21, or 22, Penal Code;
 (2)  require biological evidence [Except as provided by
 Subsection (d), material required] to be preserved [under this
 article must be preserved]:
 (A)  for not less than 60 years if there is an
 unapprehended actor associated with the offense; or
 (B)  in a case in which a defendant has been
 convicted, placed on deferred adjudication community supervision,
 or adjudicated as having engaged in delinquent conduct and there
 are no additional unapprehended actors associated with the offense:
 (i) [(1)]  until the inmate is executed,
 dies, or is released on parole, if the defendant is [was] convicted
 of a capital felony; [or]
 (ii) [(2)]  until the defendant dies,
 completes the defendant's sentence, or is released on parole or
 mandatory supervision, if the defendant is sentenced to a term of
 confinement or imprisonment in the Texas Department of Criminal
 Justice;
 (iii)  until the defendant completes the
 defendant's term of community supervision, including deferred
 adjudication community supervision, if the defendant is placed on
 community supervision;
 (iv)  until the defendant dies, completes
 the defendant's sentence, or is released on parole, mandatory
 supervision, or juvenile probation, if the defendant is committed
 to the Texas Youth Commission; or
 (v)  until the defendant completes the
 defendant's term of juvenile probation, including a term of
 community supervision upon transfer of supervision to a criminal
 court, if the defendant is placed on juvenile probation; and
 (3)  specify procedures for the collection, storage,
 preservation, and retrieval of evidence.
 (d)  The attorney representing the state, clerk, or other
 officer in possession of biological evidence [described by
 Subsection (b)] may destroy the evidence after expiration of the
 retention period specified by the rules adopted under Subsection
 (c)(2)[, but only] if the attorney, clerk, or officer by mail
 notifies the defendant, the last attorney of record for the
 defendant, and the convicting court of the decision to destroy the
 evidence and a written objection is not received by the attorney,
 clerk, or officer from the defendant, attorney of record, or court
 before the 91st day after the later of the following dates:
 (1)  the date on which the attorney representing the
 state, clerk, or other officer receives proof that the defendant
 received notice of the planned destruction of evidence; or
 (2)  the date on which notice of the planned
 destruction of evidence is mailed to the last attorney of record for
 the defendant.
 (e)  To the extent of any conflict, this article controls
 over Article 2.21.
 (f)  The Department of Public Safety shall adopt rules
 authorizing [(f)(1)     This subsection applies only to evidence
 described by Subsection (b) that was used to prosecute and convict a
 defendant of an offense under Chapter 19, 21, or 22, Penal Code, if
 on conviction of the offense the defendant was sentenced to a term
 of imprisonment of 10 years or more.
 [(2)  In] a county with a population less than 100,000
 to [, the attorney representing the state, clerk, or other officer
 in possession of any evidence to which this subsection applies
 shall] ensure the preservation of biological [the] evidence by
 promptly delivering the evidence to the Department of Public Safety
 for storage in accordance with Section 411.052, Government Code,
 and department rules.
 (g)  A person described by Subsection (b) may solicit and
 accept gifts, grants, donations, and contributions to support the
 collection, storage, preservation, retrieval, and destruction of
 biological evidence.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The Department of Public Safety of the
 State of Texas, in adopting the initial rules required by Article
 38.43, Code of Criminal Procedure, as amended by this Act, shall
 consult with:
 (1)  large, medium, and small law enforcement agencies;
 (2)  law enforcement associations;
 (3)  scientific experts in the collection,
 preservation, storage, and retrieval of biological evidence; and
 (4)  organizations engaged in the development of law
 enforcement policy, such as:
 (A)  the National Institute of Standards and
 Technology of the United States Commerce Department;
 (B)  the Texas District and County Attorneys
 Association;
 (C)  the Texas Criminal Defense Lawyers
 Association;
 (D)  the Texas Association of Property and
 Evidence Inventory Technicians; and
 (E)  other organizations in this state that
 represent clients pursuing claims of innocence based on
 post-conviction biological evidence.
 (b)  The Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas
 shall adopt the rules required by Article 38.43, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, as amended by this Act, not later than September 1, 2012.
 (c)  The change in law made by Article 38.43, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, as amended by this Act, applies only to
 biological evidence collected, stored, preserved, retrieved, or
 destroyed on or after January 1, 2013. Biological evidence
 collected, stored, preserved, retrieved, or destroyed before
 January 1, 2013, is covered by the law that was in effect
 immediately before the effective date of this Act, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *