Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1616 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1616


 AN ACT
 relating to the collection, storage, preservation, analysis,
 retrieval, and destruction of biological evidence.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 38.43, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Art. 38.43.  [PRESERVATION OF] EVIDENCE CONTAINING
 BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL. (a)  In this article, "biological evidence"
 means:
 (1)  the contents of a sexual assault examination kit;
 or
 (2)  any item that contains blood, semen, hair, saliva,
 skin tissue, fingernail scrapings, bone, bodily fluids, or any
 other identifiable biological material that was collected as part
 of an investigation of an alleged felony offense or conduct
 constituting a felony offense that might reasonably be used to [In a
 criminal case in which a defendant is convicted, the attorney
 representing the state, a clerk, or any other officer in possession
 of evidence described by Subsection (b) shall ensure the
 preservation of the evidence.
 [(b)  This article applies to evidence that:
 [(1)     was in the possession of the state during the
 prosecution of the case; and
 [(2)     at the time of conviction was known to contain
 biological material that if subjected to scientific testing would
 more likely than not]:
 (A)  establish the identity of the person
 committing the offense or engaging in the conduct constituting the
 offense; or
 (B)  exclude a person from the group of persons
 who could have committed the offense or engaged in the conduct
 constituting the offense.
 (b)  This article applies to a governmental or public entity
 or an individual, including a law enforcement agency, prosecutor's
 office, court, public hospital, or crime laboratory, that is
 charged with the collection, storage, preservation, analysis, or
 retrieval of biological evidence.
 (c)  An entity or individual described by Subsection (b)
 shall ensure that biological evidence collected pursuant to an
 investigation or prosecution of a felony offense or conduct
 constituting a felony offense is retained and [Except as provided
 by Subsection (d), material required to be preserved under this
 article must be] preserved:
 (1)  for not less than 40 years, or until the applicable
 statute of limitations has expired, if there is an unapprehended
 actor associated with the offense; or
 (2)  in a case in which a defendant has been convicted,
 placed on deferred adjudication community supervision, or
 adjudicated as having engaged in delinquent conduct and there are
 no additional unapprehended actors associated with the offense:
 (A)  until the inmate is executed, dies, or is
 released on parole, if the defendant is [was] convicted of a capital
 felony; [or]
 (B) [(2)]  until the defendant dies, completes
 the defendant's sentence, or is released on parole or mandatory
 supervision, if the defendant is sentenced to a term of confinement
 or imprisonment in the Texas Department of Criminal Justice;
 (C)  until the defendant completes the
 defendant's term of community supervision, including deferred
 adjudication community supervision, if the defendant is placed on
 community supervision;
 (D)  until the defendant dies, completes the
 defendant's sentence, or is released on parole, mandatory
 supervision, or juvenile probation, if the defendant is committed
 to the Texas Youth Commission; or
 (E)  until the defendant completes the
 defendant's term of juvenile probation, including a term of
 community supervision upon transfer of supervision to a criminal
 court, if the defendant is placed on juvenile probation.
 (d)  The attorney representing the state, clerk, or other
 officer in possession of biological evidence described by
 Subsection (a) [(b)] may destroy the evidence, but only if the
 attorney, clerk, or officer by mail notifies the defendant, the
 last attorney of record for the defendant, and the convicting court
 of the decision to destroy the evidence and a written objection is
 not received by the attorney, clerk, or officer from the defendant,
 attorney of record, or court before the 91st day after the later of
 the following dates:
 (1)  the date on which the attorney representing the
 state, clerk, or other officer receives proof that the defendant
 received notice of the planned destruction of evidence; or
 (2)  the date on which notice of the planned
 destruction of evidence is mailed to the last attorney of record for
 the defendant.
 (e)  To the extent of any conflict, this article controls
 over Article 2.21.
 (f)  The Department of Public Safety shall adopt standards
 and rules authorizing [(f)(1)     This subsection applies only to
 evidence described by Subsection (b) that was used to prosecute and
 convict a defendant of an offense under Chapter 19, 21, or 22, Penal
 Code, if on conviction of the offense the defendant was sentenced to
 a term of imprisonment of 10 years or more.
 [(2)  In] a county with a population less than 100,000
 to[, the attorney representing the state, clerk, or other officer
 in possession of any evidence to which this subsection applies
 shall] ensure the preservation of biological [the] evidence by
 promptly delivering the evidence to the Department of Public Safety
 for storage in accordance with Section 411.052, Government Code,
 and department rules.
 (g)  The Department of Public Safety shall adopt standards
 and rules, consistent with best practices, relating to a person
 described by Subsection (b), that specify the manner of collection,
 storage, preservation, and retrieval of biological evidence.
 (h)  A person described by Subsection (b) may solicit and
 accept gifts, grants, donations, and contributions to support the
 collection, storage, preservation, retrieval, and destruction of
 biological evidence.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The Department of Public Safety of the
 State of Texas, in adopting the initial standards and rules
 required by Article 38.43, Code of Criminal Procedure, as amended
 by this Act, shall consult with:
 (1)  large, medium, and small law enforcement agencies;
 (2)  law enforcement associations;
 (3)  scientific experts in the collection,
 preservation, storage, and retrieval of biological evidence; and
 (4)  organizations engaged in the development of law
 enforcement policy, such as:
 (A)  the National Institute of Standards and
 Technology of the United States Commerce Department;
 (B)  the Texas District and County Attorneys
 Association;
 (C)  the Texas Criminal Defense Lawyers
 Association;
 (D)  the Texas Association of Property and
 Evidence Inventory Technicians; and
 (E)  other organizations in this state that
 represent clients pursuing claims of innocence based on
 post-conviction biological evidence.
 (b)  The Department of Public Safety of the State of Texas
 shall adopt the standards and rules required by Article 38.43, Code
 of Criminal Procedure, as amended by this Act, not later than
 September 1, 2012.
 (c)  The change in law made by Article 38.43, Code of
 Criminal Procedure, as amended by this Act, applies to biological
 evidence in the possession of an entity or individual described by
 Subsection (b), Article 38.43, Code of Criminal Procedure, as
 amended by this Act, on the effective date of this Act, regardless
 of whether the evidence was collected before, on, or after the
 effective date of this Act.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c) of this section, an
 entity or individual described by Subsection (b), Article 38.43,
 Code of Criminal Procedure, as amended by this Act, is not required
 to comply with the standards and rules adopted under Subsection
 (g), Article 38.43, Code of Criminal Procedure, as added by this
 Act, before January 1, 2013.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1616 passed the Senate on
 May 9, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2011, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1616 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 23, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor