Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1619 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1619


 AN ACT
 relating to participation of public high school students in college
 credit programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a-2), Section 28.009, Education
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a-2)  A school district is not required to pay a student's
 tuition or other associated costs for taking a course under this
 section.  This subsection expires September 1, 2013 [2011].
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (g), Section 42.005, Education Code,
 as effective September 1, 2011, is amended to read as follows:
 (g)  If a student may receive course credit toward the
 student's high school academic requirements and toward the
 student's higher education academic requirements for a single
 course, including a course provided under Section 28.009 by a
 public institution of higher education, the time during which the
 student attends the course shall be counted as part of the minimum
 number of instructional hours required for a student to be
 considered a full-time student in average daily attendance for
 purposes of this section.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect August 31, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1619 passed the Senate on
 April 28, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1619 passed the House on
 May 25, 2011, by the following vote:  Yeas 147, Nays 0, one
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor