Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1620 Enrolled / Bill

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    S.B. No. 1620


 AN ACT
 relating to substitution of certain career and technology courses
 for certain mathematics and science courses otherwise required
 under the recommended high school program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 21.044, Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 21.044.  EDUCATOR PREPARATION.  (a)  The board shall
 propose rules establishing the training requirements a person must
 accomplish to obtain a certificate, enter an internship, or enter
 an induction-year program. The board shall specify the minimum
 academic qualifications required for a certificate.
 (b)  In proposing rules under this section, the board shall
 specify that to obtain a certificate to teach an "applied STEM
 course," as that term is defined by Section 28.027, at a secondary
 school, a person must:
 (1)  pass the certification test administered by the
 recognized national or international business and industry group
 that created the curriculum the applied STEM course is based on; and
 (2)  have at a minimum:
 (A)  an associate degree from an accredited
 institution of higher education; and
 (B)  three years of work experience in an
 occupation for which the applied STEM course is intended to prepare
 the student.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.027 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.027.  APPLIED SCIENCE, TECHNOLOGY, ENGINEERING, AND
 MATHEMATICS COURSES. (a)  In this section, "applied STEM course"
 means an applied science, technology, engineering, or mathematics
 course offered as part of a school district's career and technology
 education curriculum.
 (b)  The State Board of Education shall establish a process
 under which an applied STEM course may be reviewed and approved for
 purposes of satisfying the mathematics and science curriculum
 requirements for the recommended high school program imposed under
 Section 28.025(b-1)(1)(A) through substitution of the applied STEM
 course for a specific mathematics or science course otherwise
 required under the recommended high school program and completed
 during the student's fourth year of mathematics or science course
 work.  The State Board of Education may only approve a course to
 substitute for a mathematics course taken after successful
 completion of Algebra I and geometry and after successful
 completion of or concurrently with Algebra II. The State Board of
 Education may only approve a course to substitute for a science
 course taken after successful completion of biology and chemistry
 and after successful completion of or concurrently with physics.
 (c)  The process must provide that an applied STEM course is
 entitled to be approved for the purpose described by Subsection (b)
 if the course meets the following requirements:
 (1)  the applied STEM course is part of a curriculum
 created by a recognized national or international business and
 industry group to prepare a student for a national or international
 business and industry certification or license;
 (2)  the applied STEM course qualifies as:
 (A)  a dual credit course; or
 (B)  an articulated postsecondary course provided
 for local credit or articulated postsecondary advanced technical
 credit course provided for state credit;
 (3)  the essential knowledge and skills covered in the
 applied STEM course are equivalent to the essential knowledge and
 skills covered in the mathematics or science course for which the
 applied STEM course is proposed to be approved for substitution;
 and
 (4)  the applied STEM course:
 (A)  provides substantial mathematics content or
 science content, as applicable, taught in an applied or symbolic
 format, that enables a student to develop relevant critical
 thinking skills necessary for preparation for employment or
 additional training in a career identified by the Texas Workforce
 Commission as a high-demand or emerging occupation; and
 (B)  incorporates college and career readiness
 skills.
 (d)  If an applied STEM course approved under this section is
 part of a coherent sequence of career and technology courses, a
 student is eligible to enroll in the applied STEM course for the
 purpose described in Subsection (b) only if the student has
 completed the prerequisite course work, if any, for the applied
 STEM course.
 SECTION 3.  Subsection (b-2), Section 28.025, Education
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b-2)  In adopting rules under Subsection (b-1), the State
 Board of Education shall allow a student to comply with the
 curriculum requirements for a mathematics course under Subsection
 (b-1)(1) taken after the successful completion of Algebra I and
 geometry and either after the successful completion of or
 concurrently with [an] Algebra II [course] or a science course
 under Subsection (b-1)(1) taken after the successful completion of
 biology and chemistry and either after the successful completion of
 or concurrently with [a] physics [course] by successfully
 completing an advanced career and technical course designated by
 the State Board of Education as containing substantively similar
 and rigorous academic content. A student may use the option
 provided by this subsection for not more than two courses.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter C, Chapter 61, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 61.0517 to read as follows:
 Sec. 61.0517.  APPLIED STEM COURSES. (a)  In this section,
 "applied STEM course" means an applied science, technology,
 engineering, or mathematics course offered as part of a school
 district's career and technology education curriculum and
 approved, as provided by Section 28.027, by the State Board of
 Education for purposes of satisfying the mathematics and science
 curriculum requirements for the recommended high school program
 imposed under Section 28.025(b-1)(1)(A).
 (b)  The board shall work with institutions of higher
 education to ensure that credit for an applied STEM course may be
 applied to relevant degree programs offered by institutions of
 higher education in this state.
 (c)  The board shall include applied STEM courses in the
 board's review of courses considered for approval for offer by a
 public junior college or public technical institute.
 SECTION 5.  Not later than September 1, 2012, the
 commissioner of education shall establish and implement the process
 required by Section 28.027, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1620 passed the Senate on
 April 28, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 27, 2011, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 1620 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 25, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 147,
 Nays 0, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor