Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1649 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson, Davis S.B. No. 1649
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland
 Security; April 28, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 April 28, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1649 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a grant program to support the prosecution of certain
 crimes.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 772, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 772.0071 to read as follows:
 Sec. 772.0071.  PROSECUTION OF BORDER CRIME GRANT PROGRAM.
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Border crime" means any crime that occurs in the
 border region and that undermines public safety or security,
 including an offense:
 (A)  during the prosecution of which an
 affirmative finding may be requested under Section 3g(a)(2),
 Article 42.12, Code of Criminal Procedure;
 (B)  under Chapter 19, 20, 20A, 46, or 71, Penal
 Code;
 (C)  under Title 7 or 8, Penal Code;
 (D)  under Chapter 481, Health and Safety Code;
 (E)  committed by a person who is not a citizen or
 national of the United States and is not lawfully present in the
 United States; or
 (F)  that is coordinated with or related to
 activities or crimes that occur or are committed in the United
 Mexican States.
 (2)  "Border region" means the portion of this state
 that is located in a county:
 (A)  that is adjacent to an international border;
 (B)  in which a border checkpoint is located; or
 (C)  not otherwise described by Paragraph (A) or
 (B) if any portion of the county is located within a judicial
 district that:
 (i)  contains any portion of a county
 described by Paragraph (A) or (B); or
 (ii)  is adjacent to a judicial district
 that contains any portion of a county described by Paragraph (A) or
 (B).
 (3)  "Criminal justice division" means the criminal
 justice division established under Section 772.006.
 (4)  "Eligible prosecuting attorney" means an attorney
 in a border region who represents the state in the prosecution of
 felonies.
 (b)  The criminal justice division shall establish and
 administer a grant program through which an eligible prosecuting
 attorney or the attorney's office may apply for a grant to support
 the prosecution of border crime in a county or counties under the
 jurisdiction of the attorney.
 (c)  The criminal justice division shall establish:
 (1)  additional eligibility criteria for grant
 applicants;
 (2)  grant application procedures;
 (3)  guidelines relating to grant amounts;
 (4)  procedures for evaluating grant applications; and
 (5)  procedures for monitoring the use of a grant
 awarded under the program and ensuring compliance with any
 conditions of a grant.
 (d)  Undedicated and unobligated funds in the operators and
 chauffeurs license account may be appropriated only to the criminal
 justice division for the purpose of awarding grants under this
 section.  The account is exempt from the application of Section
 403.095.
 (e)  The criminal justice division shall include in the
 biennial report required by Section 772.006(a)(9) a detailed
 reporting of the results and performance of the grant program
 administered under this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *