Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1650 Senate Committee Report / Analysis

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    BILL ANALYSIS        Senate Research Center   C.S.S.B. 1650     82R18988 TRH-D   By: Watson         Transportation & Homeland Security         4/4/2011         Committee Report (Substituted)    

BILL ANALYSIS

 

 

Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 1650
82R18988 TRH-D By: Watson
 Transportation & Homeland Security
 4/4/2011
 Committee Report (Substituted)

Senate Research Center

C.S.S.B. 1650

82R18988 TRH-D

By: Watson

 

Transportation & Homeland Security

 

4/4/2011

 

Committee Report (Substituted)

       AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT   Comprehensive development agreements cover a range of contracting options from the most basic, from mere design and construction (called design-build) to the most inclusive (called design-build-finance-operate-maintain-concession payment). The ability to contract for multiple services at once can save significant time for full build-out and cost for major infrastructure projects as well as provide private sector financing when public dollars are not available or are insufficient to complete the project.   The authorization for regional mobility authorities to enter any type of comprehensive development agreement expires on August 31, 2011. It has been the practice of the past two legislatures to authorize these types of agreements on a project-by-project basis.   C.S.S.B. 1650 adds a project to the list of projects eligible to use this type of agreement: Loop 1 (the MoPac Improvement Project) from Farm-to-Market Road 734 (Parmer Lane) to Cesar Chavez Street.   C.S.S.B. 1650 amends current law relating to certain comprehensive development agreements of regional mobility authorities.   RULEMAKING AUTHORITY   This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.   SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS   SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter G, Chapter 370, Transportation Code, by adding Section 370.3052, as follows:   Sec. 370.3052. LIMITED AUTHORITY FOR CERTAIN PROJECTS USING COMPREHENSIVE DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENTS. Authorizes certain regional mobility authorities, notwithstanding Sections 370.305(d) (relating to entering into a comprehensive development agreement expiring on August 31, 2009) and (f) (relating to entering into a comprehensive development agreement expiring on August 31, 2011), to enter into a comprehensive development agreement relating to improvements to the Loop 1 (MoPac Improvement) project, from Farm-to-Market Road 734 to Cesar Chavez Street.   SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2011.     

 

 

 

AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT

 

Comprehensive development agreements cover a range of contracting options from the most basic, from mere design and construction (called design-build) to the most inclusive (called design-build-finance-operate-maintain-concession payment). The ability to contract for multiple services at once can save significant time for full build-out and cost for major infrastructure projects as well as provide private sector financing when public dollars are not available or are insufficient to complete the project.

 

The authorization for regional mobility authorities to enter any type of comprehensive development agreement expires on August 31, 2011. It has been the practice of the past two legislatures to authorize these types of agreements on a project-by-project basis.

 

C.S.S.B. 1650 adds a project to the list of projects eligible to use this type of agreement: Loop 1 (the MoPac Improvement Project) from Farm-to-Market Road 734 (Parmer Lane) to Cesar Chavez Street.

 

C.S.S.B. 1650 amends current law relating to certain comprehensive development agreements of regional mobility authorities.

 

RULEMAKING AUTHORITY

 

This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency.

 

SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS

 

SECTION 1. Amends Subchapter G, Chapter 370, Transportation Code, by adding Section 370.3052, as follows:

 

Sec. 370.3052. LIMITED AUTHORITY FOR CERTAIN PROJECTS USING COMPREHENSIVE DEVELOPMENT AGREEMENTS. Authorizes certain regional mobility authorities, notwithstanding Sections 370.305(d) (relating to entering into a comprehensive development agreement expiring on August 31, 2009) and (f) (relating to entering into a comprehensive development agreement expiring on August 31, 2011), to enter into a comprehensive development agreement relating to improvements to the Loop 1 (MoPac Improvement) project, from Farm-to-Market Road 734 to Cesar Chavez Street.

 

SECTION 2. Effective date: upon passage or September 1, 2011.