Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1652 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Watson S.B. No. 1652
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; May 11, 2011,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1652 By:  Patrick


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the implementation of new processes for the purposes of
 budget transparency, fiscal responsibility, and open government.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 322.003, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (f) to read as follows:
 (f)  The board shall hold a public hearing in November of
 each state fiscal year to hear a report from the comptroller and
 receive public testimony regarding the financial condition of this
 state. The report from the comptroller must:
 (1)  specify for each revenue source included in
 determining the estimate of anticipated revenue for purposes of the
 most recent statement required by Section 49a, Article III, Texas
 Constitution, the total net revenue actually collected from that
 source for the state fiscal year as of the end of the most recent
 state fiscal quarter;
 (2)  compare for the period described by Subdivision
 (1) the total net revenue collected from each revenue source
 required to be specified under that subdivision with the
 anticipated revenue from that source that was included for purposes
 of determining the estimate of anticipated revenue in the statement
 required by Section 49a, Article III, Texas Constitution;
 (3)  specify for each state revenue source resulting
 from a law taking effect after the comptroller submitted the most
 recent statement required by Section 49a, Article III, Texas
 Constitution, the estimated total net revenue collected from that
 source for the state fiscal year as of the end of the most recent
 state fiscal quarter;
 (4)  summarize indicators of state economic trends
 experienced since the most recent statement required by Section
 49a, Article III, Texas Constitution; and
 (5)  summarize anticipated state economic trends and
 the anticipated effect of the trends on state revenue collections.
 SECTION 2.  Section 322.008, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  For each state fee the amount of which is proposed or
 authorized to be increased by a provision of the general
 appropriations bill, the general appropriations bill must set out
 in a separate section of the bill:
 (1)  the statutory authority for the fee;
 (2)  the amount of the fee increase;
 (3)  each purpose for which the fee revenue is to be
 used; and
 (4)  into which fund the fee revenue will be deposited.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 322, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 322.022 to read as follows:
 Sec. 322.022.  PUBLIC HEARING ON INTERIM BUDGET REDUCTION
 REQUEST. (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Interim budget reduction request" means a request
 communicated in any manner for a state agency to make adjustments to
 the strategies, methods of finance, performance measures, or riders
 applicable to the agency through the state budget in effect on the
 date the request is communicated that, if implemented, would reduce
 the agency's total expenditures for the current state fiscal
 biennium to an amount less than the total amount that otherwise
 would be permissible based on the appropriations made to the agency
 in the budget.
 (2)  "State agency" means an office, department, board,
 commission, institution, or other entity to which a legislative
 appropriation is made.
 (b)  A state agency shall provide to the board a detailed
 report of any expenditure reduction plan that:
 (1)  the agency develops in response to an interim
 budget reduction request made by the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, or a member of the legislature, or any combination of
 those persons; and
 (2)  if implemented, would reduce the agency's total
 expenditures for the current state fiscal biennium to an amount
 less than the total amount that otherwise would be permissible
 based on the appropriations made to the agency in the state budget
 for the biennium.
 (c)  The board shall hold a public hearing to solicit
 testimony on an expenditure reduction plan a state agency reports
 to the board as required by Subsection (b) as soon as practicable
 after receiving the report. The agency may not implement any
 element of the plan until the conclusion of the hearing.
 (d)  This section does not apply to an expenditure reduction
 a state agency desires to make that does not directly or indirectly
 result from an interim budget reduction request made by the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, or a member of the legislature,
 or any combination of those persons.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter B, Chapter 403, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 403.0145 to read as follows:
 Sec. 403.0145.  PUBLICATION OF FEES SCHEDULE. As soon as
 practicable after the end of each state fiscal year, the
 comptroller shall publish a schedule of all revenue to the state
 from fees authorized by statute. For each fee, the schedule must
 specify:
 (1)  the purpose for which the fee revenue is to be
 used;
 (2)  if the fee has been increased during the most
 recent legislative session, the amount of the increase;
 (3)  into which fund the fee revenue will be deposited;
 and
 (4)  the amount of the fee revenue that will be
 considered available for general governmental purposes and
 accordingly considered available for the purpose of certification
 under Section 403.121.
 SECTION 5.  Section 404.124, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsection (b-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Before issuing notes the comptroller shall submit to the
 committee a general revenue cash flow shortfall forecast, based on
 the comptroller's most recent anticipated revenue estimate. The
 forecast must contain a detailed report of estimated revenues and
 expenditures for each month and each major revenue and expenditure
 category and must demonstrate the maximum general revenue cash flow
 shortfall that may be predicted. The committee shall hold a public
 hearing to solicit testimony on the forecast, including testimony
 on this state's overall economic condition, as soon as practicable
 after receiving the forecast.
 (b)  Based on the forecast and testimony provided at the
 hearing required by Subsection (a), the committee may approve the
 issuance of notes, subject to Subsections (b-1) and (c), and the
 maximum outstanding balance of notes in any fiscal year. The
 outstanding balance may not exceed the maximum temporary cash
 shortfall forecast by the comptroller for any period in the fiscal
 year. The comptroller may not issue notes in excess of the amount
 approved.
 (b-1)  The committee's approval of the issuance of notes
 granted under Subsection (b) expires on the 91st day after the date
 the hearing conducted under Subsection (a) concludes. The
 comptroller may not issue notes on or after the 91st day unless the
 comptroller submits another general revenue cash flow shortfall
 forecast to the committee and the committee subsequently grants
 approval for the issuance of the notes in accordance with the
 procedure required by Subsections (a) and (b). Each subsequent
 approval expires on the 61st day after the date the hearing on which
 the approval was based concludes.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *