Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1662 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: West S.B. No. 1662
 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 7, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 7, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of costs associated with certain
 educational programs of Prairie View A&M University.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 660.004, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  Funds appropriated for Prairie View A&M University may
 be used to pay for costs associated with the university's Academy
 for Collegiate Excellence and Student Success program and Research
 Apprentice Program and the Prairie View A&M Undergraduate Medical
 Academy, including participant and employee travel expenses and
 related expenses.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *