By: Williams S.B. No. 1698 (In the Senate - Filed March 11, 2011; March 23, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation and Homeland Security; May 2, 2011, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 2, 2011, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 1698 By: Williams A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to reporting concerning inmates who are confined in county jails and subject to federal immigration detainers. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 511.0101, Government Code, as amended by Chapters 977 (H.B. 3654) and 1215 (S.B. 1009), Acts of the 81st Legislature, Regular Session, 2009, is reenacted and amended to read as follows: (a) Each county shall submit to the commission on or before the fifth day of each month a report containing the following information: (1) the number of prisoners confined in the county jail on the first day of the month, classified on the basis of the following categories: (A) total prisoners; (B) pretrial Class C misdemeanor offenders; (C) pretrial Class A and B misdemeanor offenders; (D) convicted misdemeanor offenders; (E) felony offenders whose penalty has been reduced to a misdemeanor; (F) pretrial felony offenders; (G) convicted felony offenders; (H) prisoners detained on bench warrants; (I) prisoners detained for parole violations; (J) prisoners detained for federal officers; (K) prisoners awaiting transfer to the institutional division of the Texas Department of Criminal Justice following conviction of a felony or revocation of probation, parole, or release on mandatory supervision and for whom paperwork and processing required for transfer have been completed; (L) prisoners detained after having been transferred from another jail and for whom the commission has made a payment under Subchapter F, Chapter 499, Government Code; (M) prisoners for whom an immigration detainer has been issued by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement [who are known to be pregnant]; and (N) other prisoners; (2) the total capacity of the county jail on the first day of the month; (3) the total number of prisoners who were confined in the county jail during the preceding month, based on a count conducted on each day of that month, who were known or had been determined to be pregnant; [and] (4) the total cost to the county during the preceding month of housing prisoners described by Subdivision (1)(M), calculated based on the average daily cost of housing a prisoner in the county jail; and (5) certification by the reporting official that the information in the report is accurate. SECTION 2. A county shall submit the first report required by Section 511.0101, Government Code, as amended by this Act, not later than October 5, 2011. SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. * * * * *